Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1701004

EP1701004 - Gas turbine blade having a monocrystalline airfoil with a repair squealer tip, and repair method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.03.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
18.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2014/16]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady NY 12345 / US
Former [2006/37]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Roedl, Lawrence Joseph
9074 Cascara Drive
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
02 / Hensley, Rabon
1254 Edinburg Lane
Union, Kentucky 41091 / US
 [2014/07]
Former [2006/37]01 / Roedl, Lawrence Joseph
9074 Cascara Drive
West Chester Ohio 45069 / US
02 / Hensley, Rabon
1254 Edinburg Lane
Union Kentucky 41091 / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/37]Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Former [2006/37]Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date06250562.302.02.2006
[2006/37]
Priority number, dateUS2005005426909.02.2005         Original published format: US 54269
[2006/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1701004
Date:13.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1701004
Date:16.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:B23P6/00, F01D5/00, F01D5/20
[2014/03]
Former International [2006/37]F01D5/00, B23P15/04, F01D5/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/20]
Former [2006/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Einkristalline Gasturbinenschaufel mit reparierter Schaufelspitze und entsprechendes Reparaturverfahren[2006/37]
English:Gas turbine blade having a monocrystalline airfoil with a repair squealer tip, and repair method[2006/37]
French:Aube de turbine à gaz monocristalline avec extrémité réparée et méthode de réparation[2006/37]
Examination procedure13.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/17]
25.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2014Fee for grant paid
06.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.04.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.12.2014  16.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2015/04]
Opponent(s)01  09.12.2014  16.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
25.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.03.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition23.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0736/17
21.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
15.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
02.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0869259  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-3,8,9 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 14 * * column 6, line 25 - column 6, line 38; figures 1-10 *;
 [Y]EP1217090  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,8,9 * paragraph [0033] *;
 [A]US5048183  (CANG JOHN N [US], et al) [A] 1-3,8,9 * column 3, line 59 - column 3, line 68 * * column 6, line 1 - column 6, line 9; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5584663  (SCHELL JERRY D [US], et al) [A] 1,8,9 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 27 * * column 5, line 50 - column 5, line 53; figures 9,10 *
by applicantUS5584663