Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1693582 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1693582



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 775
05.08.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.07.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
14.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.07.2015 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
14.07.2015 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
14.07.2015 French translation of claims Opposition 2
14.07.2015 French translation of claims Opposition 2
14.07.2015 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
14.07.2015 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
14.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
14.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
06.05.2015 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
06.05.2015 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
06.05.2015 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
21.04.2015 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.03.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.03.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.02.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.02.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.02.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
12.02.2015 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 4
12.02.2015 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 4
11.02.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
11.02.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
11.02.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
15.01.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
15.01.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
15.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.01.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
12.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.01.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
09.01.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
10.10.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
09.10.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.10.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
06.10.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
06.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.05.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
29.04.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
27.03.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
04.03.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
04.03.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
01.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.02.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
19.10.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.10.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
16.10.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
11.10.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.10.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
10.10.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
08.10.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
20.08.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.08.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.08.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
13.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
06.08.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.08.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.07.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.07.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
30.07.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.06.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
06.06.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
06.06.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
06.06.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
06.06.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 6
06.06.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
06.06.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.06.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.06.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
06.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
06.06.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
17.03.2012 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
15.03.2012 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
09.12.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
11.11.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
09.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
09.11.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
08.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
11.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
08.10.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.10.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.07.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.07.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
23.08.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.08.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
24.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.06.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.06.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 52
18.01.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
14.01.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
08.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
08.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
08.01.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
08.01.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.01.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
12.03.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.02.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.02.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
26.02.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.02.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.02.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
23.02.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.02.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 3
23.02.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.10.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.10.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
22.10.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.10.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
13.12.2007 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.12.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
10.12.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 4
20.11.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
20.11.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
20.11.2007 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
19.11.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
16.11.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
16.11.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
16.11.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.11.2007 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.11.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
16.11.2007 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
20.10.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.10.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
08.10.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
19.04.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.04.2007 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
23.03.2007 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
23.03.2007 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
20.03.2007 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
20.03.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
20.03.2007 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.03.2007 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
19.03.2007 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
19.03.2007 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
15.03.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
02.03.2007 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.02.2007 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 3
08.01.2007 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.08.2006 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.07.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
01.06.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.06.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 3
01.06.2006 European search report Search / examination 2
18.05.2006 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
05.04.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.04.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.04.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.04.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
31.03.2006 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
30.03.2006 Clarification whether automatic debiting intended Search / examination 1
17.02.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
17.02.2006 Description Search / examination 5
17.02.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.02.2006 Drawings Search / examination 3
17.02.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
17.02.2006 Priority document Search / examination 18
17.02.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6