Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1770625

EP1770625 - Communicating with business customers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  18.03.2016
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 20.04.2016  [2016/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
One Smart Star Limited
Drake Chambers
Tortola / VG
[2007/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Mecilati, Didi Avraham
Gordon 6
Kiryat Ono / IL
 [2007/14]
Representative(s)Körfer, Thomas , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/14]White, Duncan Rohan
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date06250962.523.02.2006
[2007/14]
Priority number, dateWO2005IL0104428.09.2005         Original published format: PCT/IL2005/001044
[2007/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1770625
Date:04.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00
[2007/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/14]
Extension statesAL06.03.2007
BA06.03.2007
HR06.03.2007
MK06.03.2007
YU06.03.2007
TitleGerman:Kommunikation mit Geschäftskunden[2007/14]
English:Communicating with business customers[2007/14]
French:Communication avec des clients commerciaux[2007/14]
Examination procedure05.03.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/16]
12.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2011Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/16]
30.06.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.09.2011Observations by third parties
31.10.2011Observations by third parties
18.11.2011Observations by third parties
29.11.2011Observations by third parties
13.01.2012Observations by third parties
02.08.2012Observations by third parties
17.08.2012Observations by third parties
06.09.2012Observations by third parties
01.10.2012Observations by third parties
21.11.2012Observations by third parties
08.12.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/16]
Appeal following examination08.09.2011Appeal received No.  T2428/11
10.11.2011Statement of grounds filed
08.12.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
08.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP15197760.0  / EP3023922
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.08.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US6625258  (RAM GEETHA [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 3, line 4 - line 38 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 15 * * column 12, line 56 - column 13, line 15 * * column 13, line 66 - column 14, line 63 * * column 15, line 6 - line 20 *
otherUS6122501
 US7555111
 US2004015455
 US6748057
 US8165970
    - GIL KALIAN, "A star is born - Article", ISRAELI YEDIOT HACHRONOT NEWSPAPER, (20050201), pages 1 - 8, XP003028414
    - "Ads with Short-Dial for businesses service from the year 2002", ISRAELI NEWSPAPER - GLOBES, (20020527), pages 1 - 10, XP003028415