Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1770625 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1770625



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 563
06.04.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.03.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.03.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 2
11.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.03.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
10.03.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.12.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.12.2015 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
25.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.11.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
06.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
06.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
06.11.2015 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
06.11.2015 Claims Appeal 4
06.11.2015 Claims Appeal 4
06.11.2015 Claims Appeal 4
06.11.2015 Claims Appeal 3
06.11.2015 Description Appeal 2
06.11.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
27.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 2
26.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
21.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
17.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
07.09.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
03.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.08.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
07.08.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 4
13.05.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.02.2014 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
24.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.12.2013 General enquiry Appeal 1
24.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
14.12.2012 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
13.12.2012 Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.12.2012 Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
13.12.2012 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.11.2012 Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
21.11.2012 Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
21.11.2012 Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 36
21.11.2012 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
21.11.2012 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.11.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 8
09.10.2012 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
09.10.2012 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
01.10.2012 Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
01.10.2012 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
10.09.2012 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
10.09.2012 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
06.09.2012 Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
06.09.2012 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
17.08.2012 Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.08.2012 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
10.08.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.08.2012 Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
02.08.2012 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
04.07.2012 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
04.07.2012 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
08.05.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.01.2012 Patent document filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
13.01.2012 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.01.2012 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.11.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.11.2011 Patent document filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
29.11.2011 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.11.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
24.11.2011 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Appeal 8
18.11.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
18.11.2011 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
15.11.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
10.11.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.11.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
10.11.2011 Claims Appeal 3
10.11.2011 Claims Appeal 3
10.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
04.11.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
04.11.2011 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Appeal 1
31.10.2011 Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
31.10.2011 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
09.09.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Appeal 1
09.09.2011 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
08.09.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.07.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
30.06.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
30.06.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
30.06.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
30.06.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
30.06.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
30.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.04.2011 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.04.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
11.04.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
22.02.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
17.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
17.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
17.02.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
03.02.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.11.2010 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.10.2010 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
27.10.2009 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
27.10.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
27.10.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
12.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.04.2007 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
07.03.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.03.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.03.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
06.03.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
06.03.2007 Annex Search / examination 4
06.03.2007 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
05.03.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 10
24.11.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.11.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 3
24.11.2006 European search report Search / examination 2
05.05.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.05.2006 Priority document Search / examination 20
22.03.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.03.2006 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.02.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
23.02.2006 Description Search / examination 12
23.02.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2006 Drawings Search / examination 3
23.02.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6