Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1710645

EP1710645 - Numerical control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2010
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
[2009/28]
Former [2006/41]For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Koji, Fanuc Manshonharimomi
Room 14-207 3494-2 Shibokusa Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0511 / JP
02 / Ogata, Toshiyuki, Fanuc Manshonharimomi
Room 8-205 3511-1 Shibokusa Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0511 / JP
 [2006/41]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[2010/21]
Former [2009/28]Billington, Lawrence Emlyn
Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Former [2006/41]Billington, Lawrence Emlyn
Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date06251209.007.03.2006
[2006/41]
Priority number, dateJP2005011116607.04.2005         Original published format: JP 2005111166
[2006/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1710645
Date:11.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1710645
Date:17.10.2007
[2007/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1710645
Date:08.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/414
[2006/41]
Designated contracting statesCH,   LI [2008/26]
Former [2006/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Numerisches Steuersystem[2006/41]
English:Numerical control system[2006/41]
French:Système de commande numérique[2006/41]
Examination procedure13.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/13]
18.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.05.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
19.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2009Fee for grant paid
18.05.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.04.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
[2011/13]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0101209  (SOFT SERVO SYSTEM INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 8, line 27 - page 10, line 17 * * page 13, line 7 - line 32 * * page 15, line 17 - page 20, line 24 *;
 [A]US2002049512  (MIZUNO TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013] - [40.45]; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]JP2000172316  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [AD]JPH07248813  (FANUC LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract *