Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1729238

EP1729238 - Image processing system, image processing apparatus, and image processing program product suited for transmitting and receiving data among a plurality of image processing apparatuses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.09.2009
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konica Minolta Business Technologies, Inc.
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[2006/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Fukui, Kazuyuki Konica Minolta Buss. Tech., Inc
1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
02 / Masui, Mikio Konica Minolta Buss. Tech., Inc
1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
03 / Ozawa, Hiroyuki Konica Minolta Buss. Tech., Inc
1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
04 / Kaneko, Shuichiro Konica Minolta Buss. Tech., Inc
1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
05 / Takayama, Norihisa Konica Minolta Buss. Tech., Inc
1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
06 / Ikenoue, Yoshikazu Konica Minolta Buss. Tech., Inc
1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
 [2006/49]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Postfach 18 04 09
40571 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Postfach 18 04 09
40571 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2006/49]Roberts, Mark Peter
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date06251394.016.03.2006
[2006/49]
Priority number, dateJP2005016100101.06.2005         Original published format: JP 2005161001
[2006/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1729238
Date:06.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/24
[2006/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/33]
Former [2006/49]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Datenverarbeitungssystem, Datenverarbeitungsverfahren sowie Programmprodukt zur Datenverarbeitung für Übertragung und Empfang von Daten zwischen mehreren Bildverarbeitungsgeräten[2006/49]
English:Image processing system, image processing apparatus, and image processing program product suited for transmitting and receiving data among a plurality of image processing apparatuses[2006/49]
French:Système de traitement de données, méthode de traitement de données et produit de programme de traitement des données adaptés à la transmission et à la reception de données provenant d'une pluralité d'appareils de traitment d'images numériques[2006/49]
Examination procedure01.06.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/29]
20.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination17.12.2013Appeal received No.  T0178/14
14.01.2014Statement of grounds filed
10.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0929023  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 2, paragraph 11 - column 3, paragraph 16 * * column 3, paragraph 20 - column 5, paragraph 27 * * column 7, paragraph 38 - column 9, paragraph 53 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [X]WO0241133  (ELECTRONICS FOR IMAGING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 14 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 4 * * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 24 * * page 19, line 8 - page 20, line 6 * * page 22, line 11 - page 25, line 6 * * figures 1,2,4,9 *;
 [X]EP1120701  (DATA INTERNAT A S I [DK]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, paragraph 9 - column 4, paragraph 15 * * column 5, paragraph 20 - column 6, paragraph 24 * * column 7, paragraph 27 - paragraph 29 * * column 13, paragraph 51 - column 17, paragraph 67 * * figures 2,3 *
by applicantJP2005161001
 JPH1042114