blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1715689


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.10.2016 Refusal of application published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
09.09.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.09.2016 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
08.06.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
08.06.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.04.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.01.2013 Change - representative published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
29.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.04.2011 Change: Appeal number
15.04.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
11.02.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
11.02.2011 New entry: Appeal number
11.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.11.2010 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.11.2010 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
13.04.2010 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
09.02.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.09.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.05.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.03.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.03.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
20.12.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2008 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
28.11.2008 Definitive list of designations published on  31.12.2008  [2009/01]
14.11.2008 First examination report
12.11.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.03.2008 Publication of search report published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
23.01.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.10.2006  [2006/43]
22.09.2006 Request for examination filed published on  25.10.2006  [2006/43]