blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1715689
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8451377Global Dossier 28.05.2013B2
US2011154430 23.06.2011A1
Priority number Date
US40562006 18.04.2006
KR20050031899 18.04.2005
US201113037922 01.03.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US7929055Global Dossier 19.04.2011B2
US2006236341 19.10.2006A1
Priority number Date
KR20050031899 18.04.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100713279BGlobal Dossier 04.05.2007B1
KR20060109666 23.10.2006A
Priority number Date
KR20050031899 18.04.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1715689Global Dossier 23.04.2008A3
EP1715689 25.10.2006A2
Priority number Date
KR20050031899 18.04.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN100527801C 12.08.2009C
CN1856051 01.11.2006A
Priority number Date
KR20050031899 18.04.2005