blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1715689

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
Examination procedure24.08.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
03.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Appeal following examination10.02.2011APPEAL FILED
11.04.2011APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
24.08.2016APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20060425
 
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK YU
 
Event date:23.04.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:23.04.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK YU
 
Event date:17.12.2008 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20081118
 
Event date:31.12.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:16.11.2016 
Event description:APPLICATION REFUSED
Effective DATE:20160824