Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1715689

EP1715689 - Image display device, method of controlling the same and home network system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.10.2016
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.11.2016  [2016/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-Dong
Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul / KR
[N/P]
Former [2006/43]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu
Seoul / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Jae Kyung
107-1807, Yeongnam Neovil Dongcheon-dong Book-gu
Daegu-si / KR
 [2006/43]
Representative(s)Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/08]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2006/43]Camp, Ronald , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date06252094.518.04.2006
[2006/43]
Priority number, dateKR2005003189918.04.2005         Original published format: KR 20050031899
[2006/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1715689
Date:25.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1715689
Date:23.04.2008
[2008/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/10
[2006/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/01]
Former [2006/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bildanzeigevorrichtung, dazugehöriges Steuerungsverfahren und Heimnetzwerksystem[2006/43]
English:Image display device, method of controlling the same and home network system[2006/43]
French:Dispositif d'affichage d'images, méthode pour le controller et système de réseau domestique[2006/43]
Examination procedure25.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/43]
24.10.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
11.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2010Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/46]
30.11.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.08.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/46]
Appeal following examination10.02.2011Appeal received No.  T0928/11
11.04.2011Statement of grounds filed
24.08.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
24.08.2016Date of oral proceedings
09.09.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.11.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
03.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1355451  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0369382  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2003056225  (BIONE ANGELO A [US]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO0109739  (UCENTRIC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6005861  (HUMPLEMAN RICHARD [US]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1355451