Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1720098

EP1720098 - System including run-time software to enable a software application to execute on an incompatible computer platform [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.03.2013
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.05.2013  [2013/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trigence Corp.
750 Palladium Drive, Ste 210
Ottawa, Ontario K2V 1C7 / CA
[2006/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Rochette, Donn
3408- 30th Avenue
Fenton, Iowa 50539 / US
02 / Liebl, Alois
131 East 23rd St., number 6F
New York 10010 / US
03 / MacDonald, Craig
23 Woodbridge Crescent Kanata
Ontario, Canada K2M 2N8 / CA
 [2007/12]
Former [2006/45]01 / Rochette, Donn
3408- 30th Avenue
Fenton, Iowa 50539 / US
02 / Liebl, Alois
71 Broadway, No. 16 H
New York 10006 / US
03 / MacDonald, Craig
23 Woodbridge Crescent Kanata
Ontario, Canada K2M 2N8 / CA
Representative(s)McBride, Peter Hill , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow
G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]McBride, Peter Hill , et al
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2009/41]McBride, Peter Hill , et al
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2008/36]Fulton, David James , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2008/31]Ede, Eric , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2006/45]McKechnie, Neil Henry , et al
Kennedys Patent Agency Limited 185 St Vincent Street
Glasgow G2 5QD / GB
Application number, filing date06252128.119.04.2006
[2006/45]
Priority number, dateUS20050676998P02.05.2005         Original published format: US 676998 P
[2006/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1720098
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/455
[2006/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/28]
Former [2006/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:System mit Laufzeitsoftware zur Aktivierung einer auf einer nicht kompatiblen Computerplattform auszuführenden Softwareanwendung[2006/45]
English:System including run-time software to enable a software application to execute on an incompatible computer platform[2006/45]
French:Système incluant un exécuteur permettant l'exécution de l'application du logiciel sur une plate-forme d'ordinateur incompatible[2006/45]
Examination procedure08.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/25]
06.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/18]
10.12.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/18]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.06.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200904   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2009
30.04.201207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002004854  (HARTLEY PETER DARREN [GB]) [X] 1-22 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 52 *;
 [X]WO0206941  (CONNECTIX CORP [US]) [X] 1-22 * page 1, line 4 - page 5, line 8 *;
 [PX]WO2006039181  (CITRIX SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-22 * page 1, line 5 - page 4, line 22 *;
 [A]US2003101292  (FISHER JOSEPH A [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * page 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 10 *