Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1860929

EP1860929 - Mobile wireless communications device having an absorber for reducing energy radiated from an RF component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2007/48]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Zhu, Lizhong
518 Mountbatten Avenue
Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2T8 / CA
02 / Corrigan, Michael
483 Alexmuir Place
Waterloo, Ontario N2T 1S5 / CA
03 / Grant, Robert
RR3 Station Main
Littowel, Ontario N4W 3G8 / CA
04 / George, Liviu
7256 Harding Cres.
Mississauga, Ontario L5N 6R5 / CA
05 / Jarmuszewski, Perry
762 Cedar Bend Drive
Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2R6 / CA
 [2007/48]
Representative(s)Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/48]Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date06252677.723.05.2006
[2007/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1860929
Date:28.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1860929
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:H05K9/00
[2007/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/48]
Extension statesAL14.05.2008
BA14.05.2008
HR14.05.2008
MK14.05.2008
YU14.05.2008
TitleGerman:Mobiles drahtloses Kommunikationsgerät mit einem Absorber zur Verminderung der aus einem RF Bauteil gestrahlten Energie[2007/48]
English:Mobile wireless communications device having an absorber for reducing energy radiated from an RF component[2007/48]
French:Dispositif de communications sans fil mobile avec un absorbeur réduisant l'énergie rayonnée par un composant haute fréquence[2007/48]
Examination procedure06.06.2006Examination requested  [2007/48]
09.02.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2008Fee for grant paid
02.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IE23.05.2009
LU23.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IE23.05.2009
LU23.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
Former [2011/22]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IE23.05.2009
LU23.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2011/17]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IE23.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2011/03]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IE23.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/26]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IE23.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/14]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/04]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/02]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2002029893  (TOYODA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,17-21 * the whole document * [A] 12;
 [X]WO0191530  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004146452  (FUJIEDA TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,12,17 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2005286191  (GELTEC CO LTD) [A] 1,12,17 * the whole document *