Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1865656

EP1865656 - Provision of secure communications connection using third party authentication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.02.2008
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/50]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Representative(s)Roberts, Simon Christopher , et al
BT Group Legal
Intellectual Property Department
PP C5A. BT Centre
81 Newgate Street, London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]Roberts, Simon Christopher , et al
BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A. BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
Former [2007/50]Roberts, Simon Christopher , et al
British Telecommunications Plc BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A BT Centre, 81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Application number, filing date06252961.508.06.2006
[2007/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1865656
Date:12.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/08, H04L9/32
[2007/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Erstellung einer gesicherten Kommunikationsverbindung unter Verwendung einer Authentifizierung mittels Dritter[2007/50]
English:Provision of secure communications connection using third party authentication[2007/50]
French:Établissement d'une communication sécurisée utilisant une authentification par un tiers[2007/50]
Examination procedure09.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/14]
19.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5)  [2008/14]
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004179682  (SOLIMAN HAMDY [US]) [A] 1,11,13,16 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0064]; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0810754  (ICO SERVICES LTD [GB]) [A] 1,11,13,16 * column 10, line 16 - column 11, line 44 *
 [A]  - TSUDIK G ET AL, "Some remarks on protecting weak keys and poorly-chosen secrets from guessing attacks", RELIABLE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 1993. PROCEEDINGS., 12TH SYMPOSIUM ON PRINCETON, NJ, USA 6-8 OCT. 1993, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, (19931006), ISBN 0-8186-4310-2, pages 136 - 141, XP010134688 [A] 1,11,13,16 * page 136, column L, line 1 - column R, line 9; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RELDIS.1993.393465