Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1745740

EP1745740 - Apparatus for obtaining cardiac data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/04]Apparatus and method for obtaining cardiac data
[2010/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2012
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2012  [2012/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2011/18]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady NY 12345 / US
Former [2007/29]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Former [2007/04]For all designated states
The General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kaiser, Willi
Carl Orff Weg 3
Emmendingen 79312 / DE
02 / Findeis, Martin
Jean-Monnet-Strasse
Freiburg 79111 / DE
 [2007/04]
Representative(s)Bedford, Grant Richard , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/18]Bedford, Grant Richard , et al
Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2008/38]Bedford, Grant Richard , et al
GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2007/04]Bedford, Grant Richard , et al
London Patent Operation GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date06253786.519.07.2006
[2007/04]
Priority number, dateUS2005018673821.07.2005         Original published format: US 186738
[2007/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1745740
Date:24.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1745740
Date:04.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/024, A61B5/046
[2010/23]
Former International [2007/04]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [2007/39]
Former [2007/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gerät, um Herzdaten zu erlangen[2010/23]
English:Apparatus for obtaining cardiac data[2010/23]
French:Appareil pour obtenir des données cardiaques[2010/23]
Former [2007/04]Gerät und Verfahren, um Herzdaten zu erlangen
Former [2007/04]Apparatus and method for obtaining cardiac data
Former [2007/04]Appareil et méthode pour obtenir des données cardiaques
Examination procedure24.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/36]
31.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2008Observations by third parties
02.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2010Observations by third parties
16.11.2010Observations by third parties
19.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2011Fee for grant paid
02.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2005004483  (LIN ABDADA [TW]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0021] * [Y] 4-6,9,10;
 [Y]US6519490  (WIESEL JOSEPH [US]) [Y] 4,5,9,10 * abstract * * column 1, lines 18-21 * * column 3, lines 12-19 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 20 *;
 [Y]EP1147740  (TANITA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [Y] 6 * the whole document *;
 [XPY]US2006116589  (PARK WON-HEE [KR]) [XP] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0013] * [YP] 4,5,9,10
by applicantUS2005004483
 US2005137628
otherDE102004058339