blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1749975

EP1749975 - Cooled turbine shroud [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.02.2014
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.03.2014  [2014/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2013/15]
Former [2007/06]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Nichols, Glenn Herbert
5767 Thornberry Ct.
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
02 / Lee, Ching-Pang
12 Camargo Pines Lane
Cincinnati, Ohio 45232 / US
03 / Brink, Kurt Grover
5482 Red Fox Court
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
 [2007/12]
Former [2007/06]01 / Nichols, Glenn Herbert
5767 Thornberry Ct.
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
02 / Lee, Ching-Pang
12 Camargo Pines Lane
Cincinnati, Ohio 45232 / US
03 / Brink, Kurt Grover
4155 Calumet Circle
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
Representative(s)Williams, Andrew Richard, et al
GE International Inc.
GPO-Europe The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/14]Williams, Andrew Richard, et al
Global Patent Operation - Europe
GE International Inc
15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2007/06]Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al
London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date06253919.227.07.2006
[2007/06]
Priority number, dateUS2005016150005.08.2005         Original published format: US 161500
[2007/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1749975
Date:07.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1749975
Date:05.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1749975
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2011
ClassificationIPC:F01D11/24, F01D11/08, F01D25/12, F01D9/04, F01D25/24, F01D5/28
[2011/40]
CPC:
F01D9/04 (EP,US); F01D11/08 (EP,US); F01D11/24 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (EP,US); F01D25/246 (EP,US); F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,US); F05D2240/11 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2007/06]F01D11/24, F01D11/08, F01D25/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2012/24]
Former [2007/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gekühlter Turbinenmantel[2007/06]
English:Cooled turbine shroud[2007/06]
French:Virole de turbine refroidie[2007/06]
Examination procedure29.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/20]
06.04.2012Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.05.2012Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
24.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2013Fee for grant paid
26.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2012
Opposition(s)13.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004047725  (TOMITA YASUOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0064] * * figure - *;
 [X]US6126389  (BURDGICK STEVEN SEBASTIAN [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 56 * * figures 3,4 *
ExaminationUS6047539
 WO9105886
by applicantUS2004047725
 US6126389
 US6047539
 WO9105886
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.