Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1736203

EP1736203 - Implantable medical device for biventricular stimulation and automatic optimisation of the pacing configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELA MEDICAL
98, rue Maurice Arnoux
92541 Montrouge / FR
[2006/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Plicchi, Gianni
Via Luca Ghini, 7
40138 Bologna / IT
02 / Marcelli, Emanuela
Via G. Gasparrini, 33
62100 Macerata / IT
03 / Renesto, Fabrizio
Via Pozzo, 48
10013 Borgofranco d'Ivrea (TO) / IT
 [2006/52]
Representative(s)Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg
SO Square Opéra
5,rue Boudreau
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/52]Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
SEP Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler 14 boulevard Malesherbes
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date06291003.921.06.2006
[2006/52]
Priority number, dateFR2005000631722.06.2005         Original published format: FR 0506317
[2006/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1736203
Date:27.12.2006
Language:FR
[2006/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1736203
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/362
[2006/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/52]
TitleGerman:Implantierbares medizinisches Gerät zur biventrikulären Stimulation und zur automatischen Optimierung der Anregungskonfiguration[2006/52]
English:Implantable medical device for biventricular stimulation and automatic optimisation of the pacing configuration[2006/52]
French:Dispositif médical implantable actif à stimulation biventriculaire et optimisation automatique de la configuration de stimulation[2006/52]
Examination procedure19.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/15]
26.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2008Fee for grant paid
29.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
LU21.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
LU21.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
Former [2011/22]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
LU21.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2011/17]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2011/03]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/28]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/14]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/07]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/02]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2005011803  (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * * page 7, line 5 - page 8, line 27; figure 1 * * page 13, lines 3-11 * * page 14, line 10 - page 16, line 15; figure 4 * * page 20, lines 14-24 * * page 25, lines 7-27 *;
 [X]US2003208240  (PASTORE JOSEPH M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0036] *;
 [A]US2004054381  (PASTORE JOSEPH M [US], et al) [A] 8 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] *
by applicantEP1108446
 EP0515319
 EP0655260