blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1886585 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1886585



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 786
07.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
30.01.2017 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.01.2017 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.09.2016 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 3
19.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.07.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
22.07.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.07.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
19.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.07.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
15.07.2016 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 1
15.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.07.2016 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
13.07.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
25.04.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
25.04.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
17.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.01.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
28.01.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
21.01.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
05.11.2015 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 8
05.11.2015 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 8
19.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.07.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
29.07.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
24.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.07.2015 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
24.07.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 3
24.07.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 4
24.07.2015 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 2
30.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.06.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.12.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
18.12.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
15.12.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.12.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
05.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.12.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
01.12.2014 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
29.09.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.09.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.09.2014 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
25.09.2014 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
25.09.2014 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
24.09.2014 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
19.09.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
18.09.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
15.08.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
23.07.2014 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 7
23.07.2014 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 7
30.06.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.02.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.01.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 34
11.12.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
10.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
23.09.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.09.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
01.08.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
26.07.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
25.07.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.06.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.06.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.06.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.05.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.05.2013 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
15.05.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
15.05.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
22.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.01.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
07.01.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
18.12.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
15.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.06.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
08.06.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.06.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.05.2012 Document concerning representation Opposition 19
25.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
06.04.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
06.04.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
02.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
02.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.04.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
01.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
01.04.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
01.04.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
01.04.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
01.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.04.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
01.04.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
05.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
02.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.10.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.10.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.07.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.07.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 6
17.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
17.07.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
17.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
17.07.2009 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
15.07.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 6
15.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
15.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.07.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
15.07.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
15.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
15.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.07.2009 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
18.09.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
28.08.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.08.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.08.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
28.08.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.08.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.06.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.06.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.06.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.06.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
26.02.2008 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
18.02.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.01.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
30.11.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
09.11.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
09.11.2007 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
26.09.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.06.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 11
05.06.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.06.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.06.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
05.06.2007 Description Search / examination 1
05.06.2007 Description Search / examination 1
05.06.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.06.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.05.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
29.05.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.01.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.01.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 2
16.01.2007 European search report Search / examination 2
20.11.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
26.10.2006 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
01.09.2006 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
24.07.2006 Description Search / examination 13
24.07.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7