Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1887742

EP1887742 - System and process for QOS-based packet scheduling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.12.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3, avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/05]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3, avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
Former [2011/02]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
Former [2008/07]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
For all designated states
DLR Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Haardt, Céline
486c. chemin des Aynats
31620 Bouloc / FR
02 / Courville, Nicolas
26, avenue J.F. Champollion
31037 Toulouse / FR
 [2008/07]
Representative(s)Sciaux, Edmond , et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/29]Sciaux, Edmond , et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
Intellectual Property & Standards
32 Avenue Kléber
92700 Colombes / FR
Former [2012/10]Nicolle, Olivier , et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
32, avenue Kléber
92700 Colombes / FR
Former [2011/46]Nicolle, Olivier , et al
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 3, avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Former [2009/18]Lebkiri, Alexandre
Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 39, rue de Châteaudun
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2008/07]Smith, Bradford Lee
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date06291290.209.08.2006
[2008/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1887742
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1887742
Date:08.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2008/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/07]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur QoS-basierten Paketplanung[2008/07]
English:System and process for QOS-based packet scheduling[2008/07]
French:Système et procédé pour planifier la transmission de paquets basée sur la QoS[2008/07]
Examination procedure13.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/40]
18.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
27.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.2011Fee for grant paid
28.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2008
Opposition(s)09.11.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.08.2006
AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
LU09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
LU09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2014/21]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/33]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/22]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/20]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/16]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/50]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/49]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/48]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/41]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/39]BE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/37]BE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/35]LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT08.02.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/33]LT08.02.2012
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2002075875  (DRAVIDA SUBRAHMANYAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract; paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0158] * * paragraph [0192] - paragraph [0296] *;
 [Y]US5247677  (WELLAND ROBERT V [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract; column 1, line 24 - column 5, line 62 *;
 [A]US2005160180  (RABJE SAMEH [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract; paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0122] *;
 [A]EP1283625  (HUGHES ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract; paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0085] *;
 [A]US6466984  (NAVEH ARAD [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract; column 2, line 35 - column 6, line 60 *
by applicantUS2007075875
 US5247677