Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1705967

EP1705967 - Off-grid decoupling capacitor of ball grid array (BGA) devices and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/39]Off-grid decoupling capacity of ball grid array (BGA) devices and method
[2009/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2010
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2007/15]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2006/39]For all designated states
Alcatel
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Chan, Alex L.
109 Fairlop Way
Nepean, Ontario K2J 5B6 / CA
 [2006/39]
Representative(s)Nicolle, Olivier , et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
32, avenue Kléber
92700 Colombes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]Nicolle, Olivier , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2006/39]Hervouet, Sylvie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil, 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand
92163 Anthony Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date06300057.423.01.2006
[2006/39]
Priority number, dateUS2005004172725.01.2005         Original published format: US 41727
[2006/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1705967
Date:27.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1705967
Date:05.03.2008
[2008/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1705967
Date:20.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/11
[2006/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/39]
TitleGerman:Glättungskapazität ausserhalb des Rasters von BGA Bauelementen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[2009/42]
English:Off-grid decoupling capacitor of ball grid array (BGA) devices and method[2009/42]
French:Condensateur de découplage irrégulièrement disposé dans un réseau pour des composants à réseau de billes et sa méthode[2009/42]
Former [2006/39]Glättungskapazität ausserhalb des Rasters von BGA Bauelementen und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung
Former [2006/39]Off-grid decoupling capacity of ball grid array (BGA) devices and method
Former [2006/39]Capacité de découplage irrégulièrement disposée dans un réseau pour des composants à réseau de bille et sa méthode
Examination procedure05.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/43]
21.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2009Fee for grant paid
30.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.01.2010
BE20.01.2010
CY20.01.2010
CZ20.01.2010
DK20.01.2010
EE20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
IT20.01.2010
LT20.01.2010
LV20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
PL20.01.2010
RO20.01.2010
SE20.01.2010
SI20.01.2010
SK20.01.2010
TR20.01.2010
IE23.01.2010
LU23.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
BG20.04.2010
GR21.04.2010
ES01.05.2010
IS20.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
HU21.07.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT20.01.2010
BE20.01.2010
CY20.01.2010
CZ20.01.2010
DK20.01.2010
EE20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
IT20.01.2010
LT20.01.2010
LV20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
PL20.01.2010
RO20.01.2010
SE20.01.2010
SI20.01.2010
SK20.01.2010
IE23.01.2010
LU23.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
BG20.04.2010
GR21.04.2010
ES01.05.2010
IS20.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
HU21.07.2010
Former [2012/42]AT20.01.2010
BE20.01.2010
CY20.01.2010
CZ20.01.2010
DK20.01.2010
EE20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
IT20.01.2010
LT20.01.2010
LV20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
PL20.01.2010
RO20.01.2010
SE20.01.2010
SI20.01.2010
SK20.01.2010
IE23.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
BG20.04.2010
GR21.04.2010
ES01.05.2010
IS20.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
HU21.07.2010
Former [2011/17]AT20.01.2010
BE20.01.2010
CY20.01.2010
CZ20.01.2010
DK20.01.2010
EE20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
IT20.01.2010
LT20.01.2010
LV20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
PL20.01.2010
RO20.01.2010
SE20.01.2010
SI20.01.2010
SK20.01.2010
IE23.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
BG20.04.2010
GR21.04.2010
ES01.05.2010
IS20.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
Former [2011/09]AT20.01.2010
BE20.01.2010
CY20.01.2010
CZ20.01.2010
DK20.01.2010
EE20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
LT20.01.2010
LV20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
PL20.01.2010
RO20.01.2010
SE20.01.2010
SI20.01.2010
SK20.01.2010
IE23.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
BG20.04.2010
GR21.04.2010
ES01.05.2010
IS20.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
Former [2011/03]AT20.01.2010
BE20.01.2010
CY20.01.2010
CZ20.01.2010
EE20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
LT20.01.2010
LV20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
PL20.01.2010
RO20.01.2010
SE20.01.2010
SI20.01.2010
SK20.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
BG20.04.2010
GR21.04.2010
ES01.05.2010
IS20.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
Former [2010/41]AT20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
LT20.01.2010
LV20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
PL20.01.2010
SI20.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
ES01.05.2010
IS20.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
Former [2010/33]AT20.01.2010
ES01.05.2010
Former [2010/30]AT20.01.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH09223861  (CANON KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]US6417463  (CORNELIUS WILLIAM P [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * columns 5-6; figures 4-7 *;
 [E]WO2006053891  (CIT ALCATEL [FR], et al) [E] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [PDA]US2005162839  (CHAN ALEX L [CA], et al) [PDA] 1-3 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH09223861