Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1739273

EP1739273 - Guide rail for a roller shutter box [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AXIAL
Rue du Moulin Gillier
42290 Sorbiers / FR
[2007/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Dubuy, M. Freddy
Soleymieux
42350 La Talaudière / FR
 [2009/09]
Former [2007/01]01 / Dubuy, Freddy
Soleymieux
42350 LA TALAUDIERE / FR
Representative(s)Thivillier, Patrick
Cabinet Laurent & Charras
3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville
B.P. 203
42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/01]Thivillier, Patrick
Cabinet Laurent & Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville, B.P. 203
42005 Saint-Etienne Cédex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date06300719.923.06.2006
[2007/01]
Priority number, dateFR2005005176827.06.2005         Original published format: FR 0551768
[2007/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1739273
Date:03.01.2007
Language:FR
[2007/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1739273
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/58
[2007/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/01]
TitleGerman:Führungsschiene für einen Rolladenkasten[2007/01]
English:Guide rail for a roller shutter box[2007/01]
French:Coulisse pour caisson de volet roulant[2007/01]
Examination procedure07.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/29]
05.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2008Fee for grant paid
29.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
14.02.2008Request for further processing filed
14.02.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.02.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
LU23.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
LU23.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
Former [2011/22]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
LU23.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2011/17]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2011/03]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/28]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/26]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/14]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/07]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/02]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]DE29714692U  (ROLLADEN & SONNENSCHUTZTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 5; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]FR2373663  (BUBENDORFF RICHARD [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 4,5 *