Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1895263 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1895263



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 852
18.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.02.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
08.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.01.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 15
28.01.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
28.01.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.10.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.10.2015 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 4
02.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.09.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Opposition 21
21.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.09.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.09.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
10.09.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
04.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.09.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
03.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
02.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
02.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
02.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
02.09.2015 Claims Appeal 2
02.09.2015 Claims Appeal 2
02.09.2015 Claims Appeal 2
02.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.09.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
11.02.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
11.02.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
10.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.12.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
23.12.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.12.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.11.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.10.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
13.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
19.11.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
02.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.07.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 15
04.06.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
04.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.05.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
22.05.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
22.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.05.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
19.04.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
17.04.2013 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 1
09.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.04.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
22.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
11.03.2013 Refund of fees Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
01.03.2013 Refund of fees Opposition 1
20.02.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.01.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.01.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.01.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
17.12.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
14.11.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
09.11.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
09.11.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
07.11.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
02.11.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
31.10.2012 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
31.10.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.09.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.09.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.09.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.09.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.08.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
31.08.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
31.08.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 15
31.08.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
31.08.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
31.08.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
31.08.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
31.08.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
31.08.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
31.08.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.08.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.08.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 65
14.03.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
13.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.03.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.03.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.03.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.03.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.03.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
21.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.02.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
14.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.02.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
14.02.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.02.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.02.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.02.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.02.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.02.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
24.01.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
19.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.07.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
08.07.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
07.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 2
06.07.2011 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 2
30.06.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.06.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.06.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
17.06.2011 Decision on the taking of evidence Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.06.2011 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Summons to give evidence Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Summons to give evidence Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Summons to give evidence Opposition 2
09.06.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.02.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.01.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.01.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 28
28.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.12.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
28.12.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
28.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 22
05.10.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.10.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.09.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 5
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 4
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 4
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
26.08.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 40
26.08.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
26.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
30.10.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.10.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
13.10.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.10.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.10.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.10.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.10.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
09.10.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.10.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.07.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
04.06.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.06.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.06.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.06.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
10.03.2008 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
06.02.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.04.2007 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.02.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 1
23.02.2007 European search report Search / examination 2
21.02.2007 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
14.02.2007 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
30.11.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.10.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.10.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
01.09.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
01.09.2006 Description Search / examination 25
01.09.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
01.09.2006 Drawings Search / examination 4
01.09.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
01.09.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
01.09.2006 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 38