Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1842545

EP1842545 - Anti-inflammatory polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2009
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.03.2009  [2009/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marinomed Biotechnologie GmbH
Veterinärplatz 1 Gebäude HA/3/Stg. 3
1210 Vienna / AT
[2007/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Grassauer, Dr., Andreas
Kraygasse 94/2/8
1220 Vienna / AT
 [2007/41]
Representative(s)Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
[2007/41]
Application number, filing date06450051.504.04.2006
[2007/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1842545
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/737, A61P29/00, A61K8/73
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/41]
TitleGerman:Entzündungshemmende Polymer[2007/41]
English:Anti-inflammatory polymer[2007/41]
French:Polymère anti-inflammatoire[2007/41]
Examination procedure09.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/21]
15.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/12]
03.11.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US5145841  (CULLIS-HILL DAVID [AU], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 53 - line 56 *;
 [X]WO2004000360  (DERMATRENDS INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0098] * * claim - *;
 [DA]US2003181415  (ZANEVELD LOUREN J D [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003181416  (COMPER WAYNE D [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * claim 40 *;
 [A]US6063773  (ANDERSON ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [X]  - GIROUD J P ET AL, "Relation between the antiinflammatory and anticomplementary activity of some sulfated polysaccharides possessing anticoagulant properties", THERAPIE 1973, (1973), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 889 - 905, XP009069780 [X] 1-10 * the whole document *