Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1835854

EP1835854 - DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IN-VIVO EXAMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.04.2016  [2016/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Given Imaging Ltd.
2 Hacarmel Street New Industrial Park
20692 Yoqneam / IL
[2011/31]
Former [2007/39]For all designated states
GIVEN IMAGING LTD.
2 HaCarmel Street P.O. Box 258
20692 Yoqneam Ilite / IL
Inventor(s)01 / GAT, Daniel
5 HaAarava Street Nesher
36863 Haifa / IL
02 / RABINOVITZ, Raphael
3 Ostrovski Street
43603 Raanana / IL
03 / BONFIS, Sharon
19 Nahal Sorek St.
20692 Yokneam Ilit / IL
 [2007/39]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2007/39]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date06700046.301.01.2006
[2007/39]
WO2006IL00007
Priority number, dateUS20040640096P30.12.2004         Original published format: US 640096 P
[2007/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006070378
Date:06.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1835854
Date:26.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006
[2007/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.01.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/05, A61B1/00
[2008/10]
Former International [2007/39]A61B5/05
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE UNTERSUCHUNG IN VIVO[2007/39]
English:DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IN-VIVO EXAMINATION[2007/39]
French:DISPOSITIF, SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'EXAMEN IN-VIVO[2007/39]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2007National basic fee paid 
26.07.2007Search fee paid 
26.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/39]
19.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/15]
11.11.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/15]
Appeal following examination23.12.2011Appeal received No.  T0475/12
14.02.2012Statement of grounds filed
11.11.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
11.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
23.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2004045374  (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [Y] 9-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0051] - [0057] - [0076] * * paragraphs [0139] - [0146] *;
 [Y]WO0230439  (E Z EM INC [US]; STERN HOWARD [US]) [Y] 9-20 * page 1, lines 6-22 * * page 36, lines 1-12 * * page 40, line 5 - page 41, line 6; figures 9-11 *;
 [A]WO2004054430  (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL]; GLUKHOVSKY ARKADY [US]; FRISCH MORDECHAI [IL];) [A] 9-20 * abstract * * page 6, line 22 - page 9, line 7 *
International search[X]US2003195415  ;
 [XE]US2006155174