Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1835854 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1835854



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 314
08.02.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.03.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.03.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.02.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 15
17.02.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 15
17.02.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
17.02.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.11.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Search / examination 3
17.11.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Search / examination 3
09.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
09.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Search / examination 6
27.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.07.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.07.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Search / examination 5
23.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 5
17.07.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.06.2015 General enquiry Appeal 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
19.09.2012 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
07.03.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.02.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
14.02.2012 Claims Appeal 2
14.02.2012 Claims Appeal 2
14.02.2012 Claims Appeal 2
14.02.2012 Claims Appeal 2
14.02.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
23.12.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.10.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
19.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.10.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
18.10.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.10.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
18.10.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
18.10.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
05.08.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
05.08.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.07.2011 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
03.06.2011 Request for correction of client data Search / examination 3
05.04.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.04.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
21.03.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
21.03.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
09.11.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
09.11.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.10.2010 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.12.2008 Annex Search / examination 1
30.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
30.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
30.12.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
29.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
29.12.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.11.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.10.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.06.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.05.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
25.02.2008 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.02.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.02.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 2
06.02.2008 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
12.09.2007 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.08.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
08.08.2007 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
26.07.2007 Annex Search / examination 34
26.07.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
16.07.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
11.05.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.01.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
25.01.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.07.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
06.07.2006 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 31