Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1845645

EP1845645 - BASE STATION APPARATUS, RADIO TRANSMISSION SYSTEM, RADIO BASE STATION PROGRAM, AND TIMING ESTIMATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.09.2017  [2017/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOYANAGI, Kenji
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, 1088001 / JP
 [2007/42]
Representative(s)Reeve, Nicholas Edward
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]Reeve, Nicholas Edward
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date06700926.611.01.2006
[2007/42]
WO2006JP300572
Priority number, dateJP2005000340711.01.2005         Original published format: JP 2005003407
[2007/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006075770
Date:20.07.2006
Language:JA
[2006/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1845645
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/42]
Search report(s)International search reportJP20.07.2006
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP07.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04L25/02, H04L27/26
[2013/11]
Former International [2007/42]H04J11/00, H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesGB [2008/06]
Former [2007/42]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, FUNKÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM, FUNKBASISSTATIONSPROGRAMM UND TIMING-SCHÄTZVERFAHREN[2007/42]
English:BASE STATION APPARATUS, RADIO TRANSMISSION SYSTEM, RADIO BASE STATION PROGRAM, AND TIMING ESTIMATING METHOD[2007/42]
French:APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE, SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION RADIO, PROGRAMME DE STATION DE BASE RADIO ET PROCEDE POUR EVALUER UNE RELATION DE TEMPS[2007/42]
Entry into regional phase08.08.2007Translation filed 
07.08.2007National basic fee paid 
07.08.2007Search fee paid 
07.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/42]
14.08.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.11.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
09.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.08.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
22.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
26.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1422851  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-21 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0123] * * figure 28 *;
 [I]US2003058786  (SATO KAZUMI [JP], et al) [I] 1-21 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0119] * * figure 1 *