Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1951877

EP1951877 - TRANSLATIONAL ELONGATION FACTOR PROMOTER FROM PICHIA PASTORIS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING RECOMBINANT PROTEIN USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Korea Research Institute of Bioscience and Biotechnology
52, Eoeun-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-333 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For all designated states
Korea Research Institute of Bioscience and Biotechnology
52, Eoeun-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-333 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Hong Weon
204-601, Mokryeon Apt., Dunsan 1-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-121 / KR
02 / AHN, Jung Oh
2-105, Kaist Faculty Apt., Doryong-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-340 / KR
03 / JUNG, Joon Ki
101-1006, Moojigae Apt., Wolpyeong-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-280 / KR
04 / CHOI, Eui Sung
307-1703, Songrim-maeul, Hagi-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-335 / KR
05 / KIM, Chun Suk
103-702, Sungwon Apt., Sanghyun-dong
Suji-gu, Yongin-si, Gyconggi-do / KR
06 / LEE, Eun Gyo
103-1307, Mokryeon Apt., Dunsan-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-120 / KR
07 / HONG, Ji Yeon
125-502, Yooseong Apt., Jeongrim-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-230 / KR
08 / LEE, Hyeok Won
110-1109, Kyeongseong-Keunmaeul Apt. Galma-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-170 / KR
09 / PARK, Myoung Soo
37-11, Gayang 2-dong, Dong-gu
Daejeon 300-092 / KR
 [2010/24]
Former [2008/51]01 / LEE, Hong Weon
204-601, Mokryeon Apt., Dunsan 1-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-121 / KR
02 / AHN, Jung Oh
2-105, Kaist Faculty Apt., Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-340 / KR
03 / JUNG, Joon Ki
101-1006, Moojigae Apt., Wolpyeong-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-280 / KR
04 / CHOI, Eui Sung
307-1703, Songrim-maeul, Hagi-dong Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-335 / KR
05 / KIM, Chun Suk
103-702, Sungwon Apt., Sanghyun-dong
Suji-gu, yongin-si, Gyconggi-do / KR
06 / LEE, Eun Gyo
103-1307, Mokryeon Apt., Dunsan-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-120 / KR
07 / HONG, Ji Yeon
125-502, Yooseong Apt., Jeongrim-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-230 / KR
08 / LEE, Hyeok Won
110-1109, Kyeongseong-Keunmaeul Apt. Galma-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-170 / KR
09 / PARK, Myoung Soo
37-11, Gayang 2-dong Dong-gu
Daejeon 300-092 / KR
Former [2008/41]01 / LEE, Hong Weon
201-1203, Mokryeon Apt., Dunsan 1-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-121 / KR
02 / AHN, Jung Oh
2-105, Kaist Faculty Apt., Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-340 / KR
03 / JUNG, Joon Ki
101-1006, Moojigae Apt., Wolpyeong-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-280 / KR
04 / CHOI, Eui Sung
307-1703, Songrim-maeul, Hagi-dong Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-335 / KR
05 / KIM, Chun Suk
103-702, Sungwon Apt., Sanghyun-dong
Suji-gu, yongin-si, Gyconggi-do / KR
06 / LEE, Eun Gyo
103-1307, Mokryeon Apt., Dunsan-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-120 / KR
07 / HONG, Ji Yeon
125-502, Yooseong Apt., Jeongrim-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-230 / KR
08 / LEE, Hyeok Won
110-1109, Kyeongseong-Keunmaeul Apt. Galma-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-170 / KR
09 / PARK, Myoung Soo
37-11, Gayang 2-dong Dong-gu
Daejeon 300-092 / KR
Former [2008/32]01 / LEE, Hong Weon
201-1203, Mokryeon Apt., Dunsan 1-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-121 / KR
02 / AHN, Jung Oh
2-105, Kaist Faculty Apt., Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-340 / KR
03 / JUNG, Joon Ki
101-1006, Moojigae Apt., Wolpyeong-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-280 / KR
04 / CHOI, Eui Sung
307-1703, Songrim-maeul, Hagi-dong Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-335 / KR
05 / KIM, Chun Suk
109-407, Han-maeul Apt., Songgang-Dong Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-503 / KR
06 / LEE, Eun Gyo
103-1307, Mokryeon Apt., Dunsan-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-120 / KR
07 / HONG, Ji Yeon
125-502, Yooseong Apt., Jeongrim-dong Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-230 / KR
08 / LEE, Hyeok Won
110-1109, Kyeongseong-Keunmaeul Apt. Galma-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-170 / KR
09 / PARK, Myoung Soo
37-11, Gayang 2-dong Dong-gu
Daejeon 300-092 / KR
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2008/32]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date06701176.719.01.2006
[2008/32]
WO2006KR00215
Priority number, dateKR2005010969716.11.2005         Original published format: KR 20050109697
[2008/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007058407
Date:24.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1951877
Date:06.08.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007
[2008/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1951877
Date:03.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR24.05.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/63
[2008/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRANSLATIONSELONGATIONSFAKTOR-PROMOTOR AUS PICHIA PASTORIS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REKOMBINANTEM PROTEIN UNTER VERWENDUNG DAVON[2008/32]
English:TRANSLATIONAL ELONGATION FACTOR PROMOTER FROM PICHIA PASTORIS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING RECOMBINANT PROTEIN USING THE SAME[2008/32]
French:PROMOTEUR DE FACTEUR D'ELONGATION TRANSLATIONNELLE ISSU DE PICHIA PASTORIS ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE PROTEINE RECOMBINEE GRACE A CELUI-CI[2008/51]
Former [2008/32]PROMOTEUR DE FACTEUR D'ÉLONGATION TRANSLATIONNELLE ISSU DE PICHIA PASTORIS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UNE PROTÉINE RECOMBINÉE GRÂCE À CELUI-CI
Entry into regional phase16.06.2008National basic fee paid 
16.06.2008Search fee paid 
16.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/32]
28.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2010Fee for grant paid
23.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.08.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.11.2010
BE03.11.2010
CY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HU03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
TR03.11.2010
IE19.01.2011
LU19.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
FR31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT03.11.2010
BE03.11.2010
CY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
TR03.11.2010
IE19.01.2011
LU19.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
FR31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2013/26]AT03.11.2010
BE03.11.2010
CY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
IE19.01.2011
LU19.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
FR31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2013/25]AT03.11.2010
BE03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
IE19.01.2011
LU19.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
FR31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2012/08]AT03.11.2010
BE03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
IE19.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
FR31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2012/03]AT03.11.2010
BE03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
CH31.01.2011
FR31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/47]AT03.11.2010
BE03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
CH31.01.2011
FR31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/38]AT03.11.2010
BE03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/35]AT03.11.2010
BE03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/33]AT03.11.2010
BE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/30]AT03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/23]FI03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
IS03.03.2011
Former [2011/19]LT03.11.2010
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2003064437  (WAN NICK [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-4 *;
 [Y]  KITAMOTO N ET AL, "Utilization of the TEF1-alpha gene (TEF1) promoter for expression of polygalacturonase genes, pgaA and pgaB, in Aspergillus oryzae", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19980701), vol. 50, no. 1, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 85 - 92, XP002359962 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 85, column R, lines 23-26 * * page 91, column L, lines 8-10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002530051260
 [A]  STEINER ET AL, "Sequence and promoter analysis of the highly expressed TEF gene of the filamentous fungus Ashbya gossypii", MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19940101), vol. 242, ISSN 0026-8925, pages 263 - 271, XP002127171 [A] 1-6 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00280415
 [A]  MUMBERG D ET AL, "Yeast vectors for the controlled expression of heterologous proteins in different genetic backgrounds", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950414), vol. 156, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 119 - 122, XP004042399 [A] 1-4 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(95)00037-7
 [A]  WATERHAM H R ET AL, "Isolation of the Pichia pastoris glyceraldehyde-3-phosphate dehydrogenase gene and regulation and use of its promoter", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970220), vol. 186, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 37 - 44, XP004054877 [A] 1-6 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(96)00675-0
International search[A]US5612198
 [A]US6265185
 [A]US5650294
 [A]US6011147
 [A]  MULLER S. ET AL. YEAST vol. 14, no. 14, October 1998, pages 1267 - 1263, XP008120696