Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1839022

EP1839022 - WEB TENSION PROFILE MEASURING METHOD AND A ROLL FOR APPLYING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valmet Technologies, Inc.
Keilasatama 5
02150 Espoo / FI
[2014/19]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
Metso Paper, Inc.
Fabianinkatu 9 A
00130 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / INNALA, Matti
Mittarikatu 4 B 2
FI-04400 Järvenpää / FI
02 / KINNUNEN, Jorma
Johan Sederholmintie 2 B 23
FI-00810 Helsinki / FI
03 / KOSKELAINEN, Jussi
Mallastehtaankatu 16 C 15
FI-33270 Tampere / FI
04 / PITKÄNEN, Tatu
Lähteenkuja 1 B 27
FI-04400 Järvenpää / FI
05 / LANNES, Petteri
Timontie 9
FI-05400 Jokela / FI
06 / NYLUND, Markus
Katajaharjuntie 2-4 C 41
FI-00200 Helsinki / FI
07 / TIILIKAINEN, Marko
Toimelantie 22 C
FI-04500 Kellokoski / FI
08 / SALONIEMI, Jyrki
Uusipitkäläntie 2
FI-40950 Muurame / FI
09 / HUUSKONEN, Reijo
Tikkamannila
FI-41160 Tikkakoski / FI
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2016/26]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2007/40]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date06701230.217.01.2006
[2007/40]
WO2006FI50027
Priority number, dateFI2005000501917.01.2005         Original published format: FI 20055019
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006075055
Date:20.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1839022
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1839022
Date:29.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI20.07.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01L5/00, G01L5/04, G01L5/10, D21F1/40, D21G1/00, F16C13/00, D21F1/00, B41F13/03, B65H23/02, D21G9/00
[2012/03]
Former International [2007/40]G01L5/00, G01L5/04, G01L5/10, D21F1/40, D21G1/00, F16C13/00, D21F1/00, B41F13/03
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/26]
Former [2007/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MESSVERFAHREN EINES BAHNSPANNUNGSPROFILS UND WALZE ZUM ANWENDEN DESSELBEN[2016/26]
English:WEB TENSION PROFILE MEASURING METHOD AND A ROLL FOR APPLYING THE SAME[2007/40]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE MESURER UN PROFIL DE TENSION D'UNE BANDE ET CYLINDRE PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE[2007/40]
Former [2007/40]MESSUNGSVERFAHREN DES BAHNDRUCKPROFILS UND WALZE ZUM AUFTRAGEN DAVON
Entry into regional phase06.06.2007National basic fee paid 
06.06.2007Search fee paid 
06.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI
06.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/50]
02.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2016Fee for grant paid
18.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.01.2016
Opposition(s)30.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
GB17.01.2017
IE17.01.2017
LU17.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
[2018/13]
Former [2017/51]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
GB17.01.2017
LU17.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/50]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/45]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/38]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
Former [2016/46]LT29.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003115947  (SALONIEMI JYRKI [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,11 * abstract * [I] 3,4,6,7,10,12-18
International search[X]US2003236637
 [Y]FI113804B
 [Y]US5592875
 [Y]WO03061865
ExaminationEP1369186
by applicant US2003115947
  US2003236637