EP1841623 - AN AIR-BAG INFLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Revocation of patent | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AB 447 83 Vargarda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUSE, Dion Viktoriagatan 5 S-441 33 Alindsås / SE | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Parry, Simon James Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Parry, Simon James Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06701487.8 | 25.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006SE00101 | Priority number, date | GB20050001772 | 27.01.2005 Original published format: GB 0501772 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006080881 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1841623 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1841623 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/264 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
B60R21/264 (EP,GB);
B60R21/26 (GB);
F42B3/04 (EP,GB);
B60R2021/2633 (EP);
B60R2021/2642 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/41] | B60R21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | AIRBAG-AUFBLASVORRICHTUNG | [2007/41] | English: | AN AIR-BAG INFLATOR | [2007/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GONFLAGE DE COUSSIN D'AIR | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 24.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE TRW Airbag Systems GmbH Werner von Braun Strasse 1 85544 Aschau/Inn / DE Opponent's representative Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE TRW Airbag Systems GmbH Werner von Braun Strasse 1 85544 Aschau/Inn / DE Opponent's representative Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | 28.06.2012 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 02.07.2012 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 17.07.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.06.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2006 | AT | 07.09.2011 | BE | 07.09.2011 | CY | 07.09.2011 | CZ | 07.09.2011 | DK | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | FI | 07.09.2011 | IT | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | LV | 07.09.2011 | NL | 07.09.2011 | PL | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | SE | 07.09.2011 | SI | 07.09.2011 | SK | 07.09.2011 | TR | 07.09.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | GR | 08.12.2011 | ES | 18.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | PT | 09.01.2012 | GB | 25.01.2012 | IE | 25.01.2012 | LU | 25.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | FR | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
GB | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LU | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
GB | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
GB | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 07.09.2011 | |
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 07.09.2011 | |
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 07.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003137133 (YAMAJI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [I] 8-13; | [I]US2004050281 (HOFMANN ACHIM [DE], et al) [I] 8-13* the whole document * | International search | [A]US6149193 (CANTERBERRY J B [US], et al); | [X]US2003137133 (YAMAJI TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2003184067 (KARRAY FAKHRI [CA], et al); | [Y]US2004050281 (HOFMANN ACHIM [DE], et al) | by applicant | US2003137133 |