Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1845410

EP1845410 - DISPLAY ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR DRIVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.09.2009
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.10.2009  [2009/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC.
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC.
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOKEGUCHI, Noriyuki
c/o Konica Minolta Technology Center, Inc. 1 Sakur
a-machi, Hino-shi, Tokyo, 1918511 / JP
 [2007/42]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date06702561.912.01.2006
[2007/42]
WO2006JP300244
Priority number, dateJP2005002867104.02.2005         Original published format: JP 2005028671
[2007/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006082697
Date:10.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1845410
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006
[2007/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.08.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/19
[2007/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/42]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEELEMENT UND ANSTEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2007/42]
English:DISPLAY ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR DRIVING SAME[2007/42]
French:ELEMENT D'AFFICHAGE ET METHODE DE PILOTAGE DE CELUI-CI[2007/42]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2007Translation filed 
11.07.2007National basic fee paid 
11.07.2007Search fee paid 
11.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/42]
31.08.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2004191838  (SONY CORP) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0062] , [0063] * * paragraphs [0076] - [0078] *;
 [A]JP2004177491  (SONY CORP) [A] 2,6 * paragraph [0011] *