Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1839265

EP1839265 - METHOD OF ENCODING AND DECODING TEXTURE COORDINATES IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL MESH INFORMATION FOR EFFECTIVE TEXTURE MAPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.02.2014
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.03.2014  [2014/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IUCF-HYU (INDUSTRY-UNIVERSITY COOPERATION FOUNDATION HANYANG UNIVERSITY)
17 Haengdang-dong, Seongdong-gu
Seoul 133-791 / KR
[2007/40]
Inventor(s)01 / CHANG, Eun Young 1124-10, Jinbuk-dong, Deokjin-gu
Jeonju
Jeollabuk-do 561-160 / KR
02 / AHN, Chung Hyun Hyundai Apt. 101-705, Doryong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-340 / KR
03 / JANG, Euee Seon 17 Haengdang-dong
Seongdong-gu
Seoul 133-791 / KR
04 / KIM, Mi Ja
17 Haengdang-dong Seongdong-gu
Seoul 133-791 / KR
05 / KIM, Dai Yong
17 Haengdang-dong Seongdong-gu
Seoul 133-791 / KR
06 / LEE, Sun Young
17 Haengdang-dong Seongdong-gu
Seoul 133-791 / KR
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]Betten & Resch
Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date06702915.713.01.2006
[2007/40]
WO2006KR00151
Priority number, dateKR2005000383214.01.2005         Original published format: KR 20050003832
KR2005010222228.10.2005         Original published format: KR 20050102222
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006075895
Date:20.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1839265
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006
[2007/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.07.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06T9/00, H04N7/26
[2012/42]
Former International [2007/40]G06T9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG VON TEXTURKOORDINATEN IN DREIDIMENSIONALER GITTERINFORMATION FÜR EFFEKTIVES TEXTURE-MAPPING[2007/40]
English:METHOD OF ENCODING AND DECODING TEXTURE COORDINATES IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL MESH INFORMATION FOR EFFECTIVE TEXTURE MAPPING[2007/40]
French:PROCEDE DE CODAGE ET DE DECODAGE DE COORDONNEES DE TEXTURE EN INFORMATION MAILLEE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE POUR MAPPAGE DE TEXTURE EFFICACE[2007/40]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2007National basic fee paid 
13.08.2007Search fee paid 
13.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
08.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/11]
29.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/11]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.05.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XPI]  SUNYOUNG LEE ET AL, An Adaptive Quantization Scheme for Efficient Texture Coordinate Compression in MPEG 3DMC, ADVANCES IN MULITMEDIA INFORMATION PROCESSING - PCM 2005 LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 73 - 83, ISBN 978-3-540-30027-4, XP019024016 [XP] 1-4,12-17 * chapter 2. Adaptive Texture Coordinate Quantization scheme * [I] 7,11
 [XPI]  SUNYOUNG LEE ET AL, "Efficient texture coordinate compression based on 3DMC", 72. MPEG MEETING; 18-04-2005 - 22-04-2005; BUSAN; (MOTION PICTUREEXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20050429), no. M11933, ISSN 0000-0247, XP030040641 [XP] 1-4,12-17 * Section 2.1 Coding concept * * Section 2.2 encoder considerations * * Section 2.3 The decoding process * * table 1 * * Section 5. Syntax and semantics * [I] 7,11
 [X]  GABRIEL TAUBIN (EDITOR), "SNHC Verification Model version 9.0", 45. MPEG MEETING; 12-10-1998 - 16-10-1998; ATLANTIC CITY; (MOTIONPICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (19981006), no. M4116, ISSN 0000-0308, XP030033374 [X] 1,12,15-17 * page 37, line 1 - page 43, line 8 *
International search[A]US6614428
 [A]US6525722
 [A]US5870097
 [A]US6573890
 [A]US6593925
 [A]KR20030004943