Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1844338

EP1844338 - SCREENING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.03.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KING'S COLLEGE LONDON
An Institute Incorporated By Royal Charter, Strand
London WC2R 2LS / GB
For all designated states
Guy's & St Thomas' NHS Foundation Trust
Lambeth Palace Road
London SE1 7EH / GB
[2011/16]
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
KING'S COLLEGE LONDON
An Institute Incorporated By Royal Charter, Strand
London WC2R 2LS / GB
For all designated states
Guy's & St Thomas' NHS Foundation Trust
Gassiot House Lambeth Palace Road St Thomas' Hospital
London SE1 7EH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / TURNER, Charles, Guy's & St. Thomas' NHS Trust
Wellchild Laboratory, 12th Floor Tower
London SE1 9RT / GB
02 / DALTON, Raymond, Neil, King's College London
Wellchild Laboratory, 12th Floor Tower
London SE1 9RT / GB
03 / DANIEL, Yvonne, Anne, Guy's & St Thomas' NHS Trust
4th Floor, North Wing St. Thomas Hospital
London SE1 7EH / GB
 [2007/42]
Representative(s)Tombling, Adrian George
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]Tombling, Adrian George
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date06703925.501.02.2006
[2007/42]
WO2006GB00328
Priority number, dateGB2005000206801.02.2005         Original published format: GB 0502068
[2007/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006082389
Date:10.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1844338
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006
[2007/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1844338
Date:20.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/72, G01N33/68
[2007/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/42]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCREENINGSVERFAHREN[2014/01]
English:SCREENING METHOD[2007/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CRIBLAGE[2007/42]
Former [2007/42]SCREENING-VERFAHREN
Entry into regional phase03.08.2007National basic fee paid 
03.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/42]
29.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
14.02.2011Fee for grant paid
14.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.01.2012  06.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Avidity IP
Merlin House, Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping
Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/28]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2012  06.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Avidity IP
Merlin House, Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping
Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2014/19]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2012  06.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Avidity IP
Merlin House, Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping
Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2014/18]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2012  06.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2013/15]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2012  06.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Avidity IP
Merlin House, Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping
Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilkinson, Marc George
Avidity IP
Kestrel House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2012/10]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2012   
Avidity IP
Merlin House, Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping
Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Broughton, Jon Philip
avidity IP
Merlin House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane, Epping
Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
13.02.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.08.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.01.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.03.2014Appeal received No.  T0611/14
23.05.2014Statement of grounds filed
21.03.2014Appeal received No.  T0611/14
22.05.2014Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
13.01.2011Request for further processing filed
13.01.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.02.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.10.2009Request for further processing filed
23.10.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.11.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.02.2006
AT20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
BG20.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
IE01.02.2012
LU01.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
[2018/17]
Former [2014/34]HU01.02.2006
AT20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
BG20.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
IE01.02.2012
LU01.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2014/27]AT20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
BG20.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
IE01.02.2012
LU01.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/29]AT20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
BG20.07.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
IE01.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/10]AT20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2012/09]AT20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
LV20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
IS20.08.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
LT20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2011/48]LT20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2011/47]LT20.04.2011
PT22.08.2011
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2004090552  (KING'S COLLEGE LONDON; GUY'S AND ST. THOMAS'NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE TR) [AD] 1-17 * page 5, line 13 - line 14; claim 1; table 1 * * page 6, line 9 - line 14 *;
 [X]  - NAKANISHI T ET AL, "Assignment of the ions in the electrospray ionization mass spectra of the tryptic digest of the non-derivatized globin, covering the whole sequence of [alpha]- and [beta]-chains: A rapid diagnosis for haemoglobinopathy", JOURNAL OF MASS SPECTROMETRY 1995 UNITED KINGDOM, United Kingdom, (1995), vol. 30, no. 12, ISSN 1076-5174, pages 1663 - 1670, XP008064680 [X] 15-17 * page 1663, column 2, line 9 - page 1666, column 1, line 18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jms.1190301205
 [XP]  - DANIEL YVONNE A ET AL, "Rapid and specific detection of clinically significant haemoglobinopathies using electrospray mass spectrometry-mass spectrometry.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY. AUG 2005, (200508), vol. 130, no. 4, ISSN 0007-1048, pages 635 - 643, XP002382665 [XP] 1-17 * page 635, column 1, notes under authors, last sentence *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.2005.05646.x