EP1848357 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING HIGH-FREQUENCY VOLTAGE FOR AN ELECTROSURGICAL CUTTING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLS Martin GmbH + Co. KG Am Gansacker 1b 79224 Umkirch / DE | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UPHOFF, Peter Finkenweg 29 79211 Denzlingen / DE | 02 /
HUG, Bernhard Anna-Müller-Weg 33a 79111 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
MARTIN, Michael Alte Sägemühle 1 79117 Freiburg / DE | 04 /
FRANKUS, Frank Vorarlberger Weg 61 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | Application number, filing date | 06704270.5 | 21.01.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006EP00529 | Priority number, date | DE20051004662 | 02.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005004662 | [2007/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006081956 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1848357 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON HOCHFREQUENZSPANNUNG FÜR EIN ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHES SCHNEIDINSTRUMENT | [2007/44] | English: | DEVICE FOR PRODUCING HIGH-FREQUENCY VOLTAGE FOR AN ELECTROSURGICAL CUTTING INSTRUMENT | [2007/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A PRODUIRE UNE TENSION HAUTE FREQUENCE POUR UN INSTRUMENT DE COUPE ELECTROCHIRURGICAL | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/11] | 30.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004138654 (GOBLE COLIN C.O) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0023] , [0060] - [0076]; figures 1,3,4,6-8 *; | [A]US4188927 (HARRIS, FRANK W) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]JPS58104511 ; | [A]EP1347705 (INSULET CORPORATION) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]WO9510082 (OAKLEIGH SYSTEMS, INC) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830914), vol. 007, no. 208, Database accession no. (E - 198), & JP58104511 A 19830622 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |