Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1844392

EP1844392 - ELLIPTIC CURVE RANDOM NUMBER GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2013
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Certicom Corp.
4701 Tahoe Boulevard
Tahoe A, 6th Floor
Mississauga, Ontario L4W 0B5 / CA
[2011/43]
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
Certicom Corp.
5520 Explorer Drive, 4th Floor Mississauga
Ontario L5N 1X8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / VANSTONE, Scott A.
10140 Pineview Trail, P.o. Box 490
Campbellville, Ontario L0P 1B0 / CA
02 / BROWN, Daniel R.l.
6033 Paddle Road
Mississauga, Ontario L5N 1X8 / CA
 [2007/42]
Representative(s)Finnie, Peter John , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2011/48]
Former [2011/38]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London
SW11 1BP / GB
Former [2011/07]Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2010/51]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London
SW11 1BP / GB
Former [2009/52]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London
SW11 1BP / GB
Former [2007/42]Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date06704329.923.01.2006
[2007/42]
WO2006CA00065
Priority number, dateUS20050644982P21.01.2005         Original published format: US 644982 P
[2007/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006076804
Date:27.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1844392
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006
[2007/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1844392
Date:04.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/27]
Search report(s)International search reportCA27.07.2006
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP12.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F7/58, H04L9/28
[2007/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/42]
TitleGerman:ELLIPTISCHE KURVE-ZUFALLSZAHLENERZEUGUNG[2007/42]
English:ELLIPTIC CURVE RANDOM NUMBER GENERATION[2007/42]
French:GENERATION DE NOMBRE ALEATOIRE PAR COURBE ELLIPTIQUE[2007/42]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2007National basic fee paid 
21.08.2007Search fee paid 
21.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/42]
05.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2012Fee for grant paid
08.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2010
Opposition(s)05.04.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
18.05.2011Request for further processing filed
18.05.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.05.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.01.2006
AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE23.01.2013
LU23.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE23.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2014/07]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE23.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/48]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/35]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/23]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/22]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/21]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/13]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/12]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/11]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/10]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/09]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT04.07.2012
BE04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
Former [2012/51]SI04.07.2012
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2004102242  (POELMANN BOUDEWIJN JOHANNES MA [NL]) [Y] 2-3,6-8,16-18 * paragraphs [0010] , [0018] , [0023] - [0025] *;
 [X]WO0113218  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-5,9-12,15,19 * page 1, line 3 - line 10 * * page 5, line 4 - line 9 * * page 10, line 12 - line 26 *
 [XY]  Don B. Johnson, "X9.82 Part 3 - Number Theoretic DRBGs", (20040720), NIST RNG Workshop, URL: http://csrc.nist.gov/groups/ST/toolkit/documents/rng/NumberTheoreticDRBG.pdf, (20091029), XP002552878 [X] 1,4-5,9-12,15,19 * page 10 * * page 15 * [Y] 2-3,6-8,16-18
International search[Y]US2004102242
 [Y]US6044388
 [Y]US6243467
 [Y]  LEE ET AL.: 'Elliptic Curve Random Number Generation' ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY, 2001. TENCON. PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE REGION 10 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE vol. 1, 19 August 2001 - 22 August 2001, pages 239 - 241, XP010556240

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.2001.949587
 [Y]  KALISKI B.S.: 'A Pseudo-Random Bit Generator Based On Elliptic Logarithms' ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY, CRYPTO 1986 vol. 63, 1987, pages 84 - 103, XP008120275