blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1844392 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1844392



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 249
08.05.2013 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.07.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.06.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.05.2012 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
16.05.2012 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
16.05.2012 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
08.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
08.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
08.05.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
08.05.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.05.2012 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
09.01.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.01.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
09.01.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.01.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
02.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.11.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
02.11.2011 Description Search / examination 2
02.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.11.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.10.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.10.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.09.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.08.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
22.08.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
22.08.2011 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
22.08.2011 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
20.06.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
16.06.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.06.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.06.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.05.2011 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
30.05.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
18.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
18.05.2011 Description Search / examination 1
18.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.05.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.03.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 8
08.03.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
14.01.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.12.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.12.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
24.11.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.11.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.07.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.07.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.07.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.07.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.07.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
15.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
15.07.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
10.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.03.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.02.2010 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.02.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
05.02.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
05.02.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
05.02.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
05.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.01.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
29.01.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
01.12.2009 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.11.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.11.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
12.11.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.11.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 3
12.11.2009 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
05.11.2009 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
30.10.2009 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
11.12.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
19.09.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.09.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
06.08.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
16.07.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.07.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
13.07.2007 Fax request to enter the European phase Search / examination 8
31.05.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.08.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
27.07.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.07.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21