Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1841483

EP1841483 - RESPIRATORY MASKS WITH GUSSETED CUSHIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.10.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Change - applicantpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ResMed Pty Ltd
1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU
[2019/28]
Former [2007/41]For all designated states
ResMed Limited
1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista NSW 2153 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / HITCHCOCK, Robin, Garth
C/- 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU
02 / DAVIDSON, Aaron, Samuel
C/- 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU
 [2007/41]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/35]Frhr.Schenck zu Schweinsberg, Elard
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2007/41]Hagmann-Smith, Martin P. , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date06704770.412.01.2006
[2007/41]
WO2006AU00034
Priority number, dateUS20050643115P12.01.2005         Original published format: US 643115 P
[2007/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006074515
Date:20.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1841483
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU20.07.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/06, A62B9/06
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ATEMMASKEN MIT GEFALTETEN POLSTERN[2007/41]
English:RESPIRATORY MASKS WITH GUSSETED CUSHIONS[2007/41]
French:MASQUE RESPIRATOIRE A COUSSIN A SOUFFLET[2007/41]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2007National basic fee paid 
13.08.2007Search fee paid 
13.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/41]
28.01.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
14.10.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination29.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0547/15
02.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004118406  (LITHGOW PERRY DAVID [AU], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0133] , [0135]; figures 6,6C,13A,13B,15-22,24-33; claim 9 *
International search[X]WO2004022146  (RESMED LTD [AU], et al);
 [X]US2004118406  (LITHGOW PERRY DAVID [AU], et al);
 [X]WO0162326  (MAP GMBH [DE], et al);
 [X]WO0197893  (RESMED LTD [AU], et al);
 [X]US2003089372  (FRATER ROBERT H [AU], et al);
 [X]US2002029780  (FRATER ROBERT H [AU], et al);
 [X]US2004144386  (FRATER ROBERT H [AU], et al)
by applicantUS2002029780
 US6772760
 US2004118406
 US5074297
 WO0162326