Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1849235

EP1849235 - RADAR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reeves, Bryan Anthony
3 Atlas Place
Chapel Hill QLD 4069 / AU
[2016/11]
Former [2007/44]For all designated states
Reeves, Bayan Anthony
3 Atlas Place
Chapel Hill, QLD 4069 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2007/44]
Representative(s)Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss
24 East Street
St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
[2016/30]
Former [2007/44]Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss 24 East Street St Ives
Cambridge PE27 5PD / GB
Application number, filing date06704829.808.02.2006
[2007/44]
WO2006AU00148
Priority number, dateAU2005090059509.02.2005         Original published format: AU 2005900595
[2007/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006084307
Date:17.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1849235
Date:31.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006
[2007/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1849235
Date:27.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/30]
Search report(s)International search reportAU17.08.2006
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:H03M1/20, G06F7/58
[2007/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/30]
Former [2007/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:RADARSYSTEM[2007/44]
English:RADAR SYSTEM[2007/44]
French:SYSTEME DE RADAR[2007/44]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2007National basic fee paid 
06.09.2007Search fee paid 
06.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
06.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/44]
31.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2016Fee for grant paid
20.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2012
Opposition(s)02.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
25.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
[2017/45]
Former [2017/37]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
IS27.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
Former [2017/07]LT27.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[AD]US6121915  (COOPER GEORGE R [US], et al) [AD] 1-20 * abstract * * figure 1 *
 [XI]  AXELSSON S R J ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Noise radar for range/doppler processing and digital beamforming using binary ADC", IGARSS 2001. IEEE 2001 INTERNATIONAL GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM. SYDNEY, AUSTRALIA, JULY 9 - 13, 2001; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010709), vol. 5, doi:DOI:10.1109/IGARSS.2001.977884, ISBN 978-0-7803-7031-9, pages 2001 - 2005, XP010572329 [X] 1,5,6,13-17 * abstract * * page 1, column 1 - page 4, column 1 * * figures 2, 3 * [I] 2-4,7-12,18-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IGARSS.2001.977884
International search[X]US4804963
 [X]  AXELSSON S.R.J., "NOISE RADAR FOR RANGE/DOPPLER PROCESSING AND DIGITAL BEAMFORMING USING LOW-BIT ADC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING, (200312), vol. 41, no. 12, PART 1, XP011105570 [X]

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TGRS.2003.816665