Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1853184

EP1853184 - ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/46]ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICE AND METHOD
[2011/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.05.2013  [2013/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kimberly-Clark Inc.
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West, Suite 1402
Mississauga, Ontario L5B 3Y5 / CA
[2012/17]
Former [2010/43]For all designated states
Kimberly-Clark Inc.
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West Suite 1402
Mississauga, Ontario L5B 3Y5 / CA
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
Baylis Medical Company, Inc.
5253 Decarie Boulevard, Suite 540 Montreal
Québec H3W 3C3 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / GODARA, Neil
3500 South Millway, Unit 59
Mississauga, Ontario L5L 3T8 / CA
02 / DAWKINS, Wesley
1275 Marcin Road
Sarnia, Ontario N7V 3JP / CA
03 / HILLIER, Taylor
311-2 Triburnham Place
Etobicoke, Ontario M9C 3P4 / CA
04 / LEUNG, Mark
163 Sterling Rd., Unit 3
Toronto, Ontario M6R 2B2 / CA
 [2008/13]
Former [2007/46]01 / GODARA, Neil
3500 South Millway, Unit 59
Mississauga, Ontario L5L 3T8 / CA
02 / DAWKINS, Wesley
31 Sandbar Willoway
Toronto, Ontario M2J 2B1 / CA
03 / HILLIER, Taylor
311-2 Triburnham Place
Etobicoke, Ontario M9C 3P4 / CA
04 / LEUNG, Mark
163 Sterling Rd., Unit 3
Toronto, Ontario M6R 2B2 / CA
Representative(s)Mabey, Katherine Frances , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/48]Mabey, Katherine Frances , et al
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2010/13]Davies, Christopher Robert , et al
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2007/46]Gosnall, Toby
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date06705184.717.02.2006
[2007/46]
WO2006CA00229
Priority number, dateUS2005028060415.11.2005         Original published format: US 280604
US20050593839P17.02.2005         Original published format: US 593839 P
US20050594787P05.05.2005         Original published format: US 594787 P
US20050595426P04.07.2005         Original published format: US 595426 P
US20050595559P14.07.2005         Original published format: US 595559 P
US20050595560P14.07.2005         Original published format: US 595560 P
[2007/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006086882
Date:24.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1853184
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006
[2007/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1853184
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA24.08.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/00, A61B18/12, A61B18/14
[2007/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   NL [2008/13]
Former [2007/46]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2011/26]
English:ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICE[2011/26]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ELECTROCHIRURGIE[2011/26]
Former [2007/46]ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN
Former [2007/46]ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICE AND METHOD
Former [2007/46]DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ELECTROCHIRURGIE
Entry into regional phase14.09.2007National basic fee paid 
14.09.2007Search fee paid 
14.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/46]
18.09.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.10.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
25.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
28.02.2012Fee for grant paid
28.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2009
Opposition(s)28.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
28.02.2012Request for further processing filed
28.02.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.03.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES05.08.2012
[2013/22]
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US6379349  ;
 [X]WO8103272  ;
 [Y]WO9510320  ;
 [Y]US5342357  ;
 [A]WO9402077  ;
 [A]WO9819613