Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1848892

EP1848892 - CRESCENT GEAR PUMP WITH NOVEL ROTOR SET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2016
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STT Technologies Inc., A Joint Venture of Magna Powertrain Inc. and SHW GmbH
600 Tesma Way
Concord, Ontario L4K 5C2 / CA
[2010/52]
Former [2007/44]For all designated states
Magna Powertrain Inc.
1000 Tesma Way
Concord, Ontario L4K 5R8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / LIAVAS, Vasilios, B.
278 Shawnee Circle
Toronto, Ontario M2H 2Y4 / CA
02 / NEMEC, Michal
36 Ladyslipper Court
Thornhill, Ontario L3T 2S7 / CA
 [2007/44]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[2015/25]
Former [2007/44]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06705194.616.02.2006
[2007/44]
WO2006CA00239
Priority number, dateUS20050653459P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653459 P
[2007/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006086887
Date:24.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1848892
Date:31.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006
[2007/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1848892
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA24.08.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:F04C2/08, F04C2/10
[2007/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2015/25]
Former [2008/21]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2007/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MONDSICHELPUMPE MIT NEUEM ROTORSATZ[2007/44]
English:CRESCENT GEAR PUMP WITH NOVEL ROTOR SET[2007/44]
French:POMPE A EMBRAYAGE A GRIFFES A JEU DE ROTORS INNOVANT[2007/44]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2007National basic fee paid 
31.07.2007Search fee paid 
31.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/44]
21.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2015Fee for grant paid
30.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2015
Opposition(s)18.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5163826  (COZENS ERIC E [CA]) [AD] 1-14 * column 4, line 18 - column 6, line 62 * * figures 2-9 *
International search[A]WO2005005835
 [A]JPS59131787
 [A]CH644188
 [A]US2004191101
 [A]US6077059
 [A]US3907470