Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1842450

EP1842450 - FOLDING TABLE WITH CROSSED LEGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.02.2012
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.03.2012  [2012/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leng, Luhao
139 West Fanghu Road, Fanghu Industry District Xiamen
Fujian 361009 / CN
[2007/41]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2007/41]
Representative(s)Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2007/41]Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date06705491.617.01.2006
[2007/41]
WO2006CN00070
Priority number, dateCN200528020717.01.2005         Original published format: CN200520080207
[2007/41]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006074615
Date:20.07.2006
Language:ZH
[2006/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1842450
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN20.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:A47B3/02
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/13]
Former [2007/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLAPPTISCH MIT GEKREUZTEN BEINEN[2007/41]
English:FOLDING TABLE WITH CROSSED LEGS[2007/41]
French:TABLE PLIANTE A PIEDS CROISES[2007/41]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2007Translation filed 
14.08.2007National basic fee paid 
14.08.2007Search fee paid 
14.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/41]
18.08.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.09.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
02.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/11]
06.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201106   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]CN2659220Y
 [X]CN2648898Y
 [A]JPH08140742
 [A]US6314893