Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1848375

EP1848375 - CATHETER FOR THE TRANSVASCULAR IMPLANTATION OF PROSTHETIC HEART VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2014
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JenaValve Technology, Inc.
Regus Business Centre Wilmington Downtown 1000 N. West Street, Suite 1200
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
[2013/45]
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
JenaValve Technology, Inc.
Regus Business Centre Wilmington Downtown 1000 N. West Street, Suite 1200
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
Former [2007/44]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
JenaValve Technology GmbH
Nymphenburger Strasse 13
80335 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / OTTMA, Rüdiger
Dorfstrasse 17
99441 Grossschwabhausen / DE
02 / MOSZNER, Robert
Köstritzer Strasse 39
07639 Bad-Klosterlausnitz / DE
03 / DAMM, Christoph
Schaefferstrasse 6
07743 Jena / DE
04 / FIGULLA, Hans-Reiner
Ziegenhainer Strasse 109b
07749 Jena / DE
05 / FERRARI, Markus
Bärengasse 13
07747 Jena / DE
 [2007/44]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/24]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
Former [2008/23]Trinks, Ole , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 48
80538 München / DE
Former [2008/14]Boxall, Sarah Jane , et al
Stratagem IPM Limited Fosters Wing Anstey Hall Maris Lane Trumpington
Cambridge, CB2 9LG / GB
Former [2007/44]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gostritzer Strasse 61-63
01217 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date06705795.012.01.2006
[2007/44]
WO2006DE00056
Priority number, dateDE2005100363220.01.2005         Original published format: DE102005003632
[2007/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006076890
Date:27.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1848375
Date:31.10.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006
[2007/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1848375
Date:06.11.2013
Language:DE
[2013/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24, A61F2/95
[2013/30]
Former International [2007/44]A61F2/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/44]
TitleGerman:KATHETER FÜR DIE TRANSVASKULÄRE IMPLANTATION VON HERZKLAPPENPROTHESEN[2007/44]
English:CATHETER FOR THE TRANSVASCULAR IMPLANTATION OF PROSTHETIC HEART VALVES[2007/44]
French:CATHETER DESTINE A L'IMPLANTATION TRANSVASCULAIRE DE PROTHESES DE VALVULES CARDIAQUES[2007/44]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2007National basic fee paid 
05.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/44]
08.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2013Fee for grant paid
21.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11162971.3  / EP2351541
EP14164683.6  / EP2786726
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2009
Opposition(s)07.08.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
[2016/31]
Former [2016/28]GR07.02.2014
Cited inInternational search[XDY]WO2004019825  (FIGULLA HANS-REINER [DE], et al) [XD] 1,7,8,10-16 * page 1, line 4 - page 24, line 20; figures 1-20 * [Y] 2-6,9;
 [Y]US6273876  (KLIMA DANIEL J [US], et al) [Y] 2-5 * column 1, line 20 - column 12, line 4; figures 1-15 *;
 [Y]US2004243143  (CORCORAN MICHAEL P [US], et al) [Y] 2-5 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]WO9953987  (JAKOUBEK MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 2-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 21; figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]EP0411118  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [Y] 6 * column 1, line 3 - column 6, line 15; figures 1-9 *;
 [Y]US2002120322  (THOMPSON PAUL J [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0078]; figure 2 *;
 [Y]EP0657147  (BARD INC C R [US]) [Y] 9 * column 1, line 3 - column 13, line 39; figures 13-17 *;
 [A]WO03051231  (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 9 * figures 1-3 *
by applicantWO2004019825
 US2004243143
 WO9953987
 EP0411118