Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1888223 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2009 | B8 | EP1888223 | 11.02.2009 | B1 | EP1888223 | 20.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102005002469 | 18.01.2005 | WO2006DE00058 | 16.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112006000678 | 27.12.2007 | A5 | Priority number | Date | DE102005002469 | 18.01.2005 | WO2006DE00058 | 16.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502006002827D1 | 26.03.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005002469 | 18.01.2005 | WO2006DE00058 | 16.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006076891 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2006 | A3 | WO2006076891 | 27.07.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102005002469 | 18.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE422387T | 15.02.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005002469 | 18.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005002469 | 11.05.2006 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102005002469 | 18.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2321551T | 08.06.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102005002469 | 18.01.2005 |