Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1888223

EP1888223 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ENCAPSULATING MATERIALS IN LIPOSOMES COMPRISING A FREELY ADAPTABLE MEMBRANE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABNOBA GmbH
Hohenzollernstrasse 16
75177 Pforzheim / DE
[2009/14]
Former [2008/08]For all designated states
Abnoba Heilmittel GmbH
Hohenzollernstr. 16
75177 Pforzheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LENEWEIT, Gero
Forststr. 65
75223 Niefern-Öschelbronn / DE
 [2008/08]
Representative(s)Schneider, Uwe
Patentanwalt Holbeinstrasse 27
59423 Unna / DE
[2008/08]
Application number, filing date06705797.616.01.2006
[2008/08]
WO2006DE00058
Priority number, dateDE2005100246918.01.2005         Original published format: DE102005002469
[2008/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006076891
Date:27.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1888223
Date:20.02.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006
[2008/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1888223
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1888223
Date:03.06.2009
[2009/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:B01J13/22, B01J13/02, A61K9/127
[2008/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINKAPSELUNG VON STOFFEN IN LIPOSOMEN MIT FREI EINSTELLBAREM MEMBRANAUFBAU[2008/08]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ENCAPSULATING MATERIALS IN LIPOSOMES COMPRISING A FREELY ADAPTABLE MEMBRANE STRUCTURE[2008/08]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENCAPSULAGE DE SUBSTANCES DANS DES LIPOSOMES AYANT UNE STRUCTURE MEMBRANE LIBREMENT AJUSTABLE[2008/08]
Entry into regional phase09.11.2007National basic fee paid 
09.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
09.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/08]
11.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2008Fee for grant paid
11.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.11.2007AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007BG   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007CY   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007CZ   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007EE   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007HU   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007IS   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007LT   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007LV   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007PL   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007RO   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007SI   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007SK   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
09.11.2007TR   M01   Fee paid on   09.11.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
[2012/47]
Former [2012/42]CY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
Former [2012/37]CY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2011/04]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/14]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/03]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9008535
 [A]WO03057191
 [A]WO9936056
 [AD]EP0310984