Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1994281

EP1994281 - A METHOD AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR REDUCING THE FATIGUE LOADS IN THE COMPONENTS OF A WIND TURBINE SUBJECTED TO ASYMMETRICAL LOADING OF THE ROTOR PLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 42
8200 Aarhus N / DK
[2015/23]
Former [2011/50]For all designated states
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Former [2008/48]For all designated states
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8900 Randers / DK
Inventor(s)01 / PEDERSEN, Bo, Juul
Sverigesvej 54
DK-8370 Hadsten / DK
 [2008/48]
Representative(s)Vestas Patents Department
Hedeager 42
8200 Aarhus N / DK
[N/P]
Former [2014/42](deleted)
...
Former [2012/32]Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S
Rued Langgaards Vej 8
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
Former [2008/48]Schmidt, Jens Joergen , et al
Patentgruppen A/S Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Application number, filing date06706123.416.03.2006
[2008/48]
WO2006DK00153
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007104306
Date:20.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1994281
Date:26.11.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007
[2008/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1994281
Date:22.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:F03D7/04
[2008/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND STEUERSYSTEM ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON DAUERBELASTUNGEN VON KOMPONENTEN EINER WINDTURBINE, DIE EINER ASYMMETRISCHEN BELASTUNG DER ROTOREBENE AUSGESETZT SIND[2008/48]
English:A METHOD AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR REDUCING THE FATIGUE LOADS IN THE COMPONENTS OF A WIND TURBINE SUBJECTED TO ASYMMETRICAL LOADING OF THE ROTOR PLANE[2008/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DESTINÉS À RÉDUIRE LES CHARGES DE FATIGUE DANS LES ÉLÉMENTS D'UNE ÉOLIENNE SOUMISE À UNE CHARGE ASYMÉTRIQUE DU PLAN DU ROTOR[2008/48]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2008National basic fee paid 
15.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/48]
26.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2013Fee for grant paid
05.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.12.2013  07.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 02  20.02.2014  24.01.2017  WITHDRAWN
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2017/09]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2013  07.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  20.02.2014  24.01.2017  WITHDRAWN
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2014/14]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2013  07.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  20.02.2014  26.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2014/04]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2013   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
01.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.07.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition14.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1601/17
02.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
06.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
07.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.03.2006
AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
TR22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE16.03.2014
LU16.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU16.03.2006
AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE16.03.2014
LU16.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/31]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE16.03.2014
LU16.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE16.03.2014
LU16.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE16.03.2014
LU16.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE16.03.2014
LU16.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
LU16.03.2014
Former [2014/14]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT22.05.2013
PT23.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US4161658  (PATRICK JOHN P [US]) [X] 1-42,1-42,1-42 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2004074681  (FORSKNINGSCT RISOE [DK]; LARSEN TORBEN JUUL [DK]; MADSEN HELGE AAGAARD) [X] 1,22,1,22,1,22 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0995904  (TACKE WINDENERGIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,22,1,22,1,22 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2117934  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [X] 1,22,1,22,1,22 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *;
 [E]EP1674724  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1,22,1,22,1,22 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *
 [X]  - BOSSANYI E A, "INDIVIDUAL BLADE PITCH CONTROL FOR LOAD REDUCTION", WIND ENERGY, WILEY, CHICHESTER, GB, (20021008), vol. 6, ISSN 1099-1824, pages 119 - 128, XP008031928 [X] 1-42,1-42,1-42 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/we.76
 [X]  - CASELITZ P ET AL, "REDUCTION OF FATIGUE LOADS ON WIND ENERGY CONVERTERS BY ADVANCED CONTROL METHODS", EUROPEAN WIND ENERGY CONFERENCE, (199710), pages 555 - 558, XP008031751 [X] 1-42,1-42,1-42 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *