Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1841610

EP1841610 - UNIT SUPPORT COMPRISING WINDOW PANE GUIDE RAILS FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2011
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.05.2011  [2011/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Integración De Montajes Y Plásticos, S.L.
Pol. Erratzu, Parcela A
20130 Urnieta Guipuzcoa / ES
[2010/23]
Former [2008/17]For all designated states
Intergración Cd Montajes Y Plásticos, S.L.
Pol. Erratzu, Parcela A
20130 Urnieta Guipuzcoa / ES
Former [2007/41]For all designated states
Carcoustics TechConsult GmbH
Neuenkamp 8
51381 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BERBNER, Jürgen
Am Mittelpunkt 4
38524 Neudorf-Platendorf / DE
 [2008/17]
Former [2007/50]01 / BERBNER, Jürgen
Albert-Einstein-Str. 14-20
63128 Dietzenbach / DE
Former [2007/41]01 / BERBNER, Jürgen
Birkenbergstr. 64a
51379 Leverkusen / DE
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2007/41]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date06706386.724.01.2006
[2007/41]
WO2006EP00605
Priority number, dateDE20052001225U25.01.2005         Original published format: DE 202005001225 U
[2007/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006079506
Date:03.08.2006
Language:DE
[2006/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1841610
Date:10.10.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006
[2007/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1841610
Date:09.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:B60J5/04
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   PT [2008/10]
Former [2007/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AGGREGATETRÄGER MIT FENSTERSCHEIBENFÜHRUNGSSCHIENEN FÜR EINE KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜR[2007/41]
English:UNIT SUPPORT COMPRISING WINDOW PANE GUIDE RAILS FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR[2007/41]
French:SUPPORT DE BLOC A GLISSIERES DE GUIDAGE DE VITRE POUR UNE PORTIERE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2007/41]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2007National basic fee paid 
25.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/41]
28.08.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.10.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
22.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2010Fee for grant paid
04.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200803   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2008
31.01.201005   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]DE10164187
 [X]DE10126218
 [A]EP1314598
 [A]EP0974478