blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1868478 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1868478



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 794
13.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.07.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
10.07.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
10.07.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
09.07.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 13
09.07.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.07.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.07.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.07.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.07.2018 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
18.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
14.05.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 20
14.05.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 16
14.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.05.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
11.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.05.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
23.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.03.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.03.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.03.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
19.03.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
19.03.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
14.03.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.03.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.01.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.07.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
07.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
02.07.2015 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
08.04.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
25.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.02.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 25
10.10.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.10.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 43
02.10.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 43
29.08.2014 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
29.08.2014 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
22.08.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 4
22.08.2014 General authorisation Appeal 2
22.08.2014 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
14.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.07.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
02.07.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
30.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
27.05.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
27.05.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
27.05.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
25.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
25.02.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
22.01.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.01.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
06.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
02.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
26.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
26.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.11.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
23.11.2012 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
14.11.2012 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Opposition 7
12.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 5
09.10.2012 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Opposition 13
08.10.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 5
08.10.2012 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Opposition 13
27.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
15.06.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 25
17.02.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
03.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
02.05.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.04.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 35
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.04.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 35
19.04.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
17.03.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
25.02.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
25.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.02.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.02.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
14.02.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.02.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
11.02.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.01.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
28.11.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.11.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.10.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
24.08.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.08.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
07.11.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
19.10.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
19.10.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
19.10.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 30
16.03.2006 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1