Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1853530

EP1853530 - FILLER WITH LIGHTWEIGHT AGGREGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/24]For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WINDHÖVEL, Udo
Haydnstrasse 24
40789 Monheim / DE
02 / FÜTTERER, Wilhelm
Gangelshauser Weg 12 A
45549 Sprockhövel / DE
03 / WITZLEBEN, Steffen
Buchenstrasse 45a
59379 Selm / DE
04 / MOLEK, Marcin
Buchenstrasse 29
59423 Unna / DE
 [2007/46]
Application number, filing date06706787.609.02.2006
[2007/46]
WO2006EP01152
Priority number, dateDE2005101030703.03.2005         Original published format: DE102005010307
[2007/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006092199
Date:08.09.2006
Language:DE
[2006/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1853530
Date:14.11.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006
[2007/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1853530
Date:01.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:C04B28/02, C04B111/40
[2007/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/46]
TitleGerman:SPACHTELMASSE MIT LEICHTZUSCHLAG[2007/46]
English:FILLER WITH LIGHTWEIGHT AGGREGATES[2007/46]
French:MASTIC CONTENANT DES AGREGATS LEGERS[2007/46]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2007National basic fee paid 
22.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/46]
29.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2013Fee for grant paid
22.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.09.2014  31.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
MAPEI S.p.A
Via Cafiero, 22
20158 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Kinkeldey, Daniela
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  30.09.2014  31.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ARDEX GMBH
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 45
58453 Witten / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel
Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
 03  30.09.2014  31.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Construction Research & Technology GmbH
Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32
83308 Trostberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Gastner, Thomas
BASF Construction Solutions GmbH
Abteilung GVX/DT
Dr.-Albert-Frank-Straße 32
83308 Trostberg / DE
 04  01.10.2014  31.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
G. Theodor Freese GmbH & Co. KG
Carl-Benz-Strasse 29
28237 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
 05  01.10.2014  31.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
MC-BAUCHEMIE MÜLLER GmbH & Co. KG
Steinberg 5
45133 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/23]
Opponent(s)01  30.09.2014  31.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
MAPEI S.p.A
Via Cafiero, 22
20158 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Kinkeldey, Daniela
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  30.09.2014  31.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ARDEX GMBH
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 45
58453 Witten / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel
Patentanwälte Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
 03  30.09.2014  31.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Construction Research & Technology GmbH
Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32
83308 Trostberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Gastner, Thomas
BASF Construction Solutions GmbH
Abteilung GVX/DT
Dr.-Albert-Frank-Straße 32
83308 Trostberg / DE
 04  01.10.2014  31.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
G. Theodor Freese GmbH & Co. KG
Carl-Benz-Strasse 29
28237 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
 05  01.10.2014  31.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
MC-BAUCHEMIE MÜLLER GmbH & Co. KG
Steinberg 5
45133 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
Former [2014/45]
Opponent(s)01  30.09.2014   
MAPEI S.p.A
Via Cafiero, 22
20158 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Kinkeldey, Daniela
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  30.09.2014   
ARDEX GMBH
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 45
58453 Witten / DE
Opponent's representative
Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte
Dolivostrasse 15A
64293 Darmstadt / DE
 03  30.09.2014   
Construction Research & Technology GmbH
Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32
83308 Trostberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Gastner, Thomas
BASF Construction Solutions GmbH
Abteilung GVX/DT
Dr.-Albert-Frank-Straße 32
83308 Trostberg / DE
 04  01.10.2014   
G. Theodor Freese GmbH & Co. KG
Carl-Benz-Strasse 29
28237 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
 05  01.10.2014   
MC-BAUCHEMIE MÜLLER GmbH & Co. KG
Steinberg 5
45133 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Zenz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
05.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
07.09.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.09.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition07.11.2017Appeal received No.  T2450/17
17.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
10.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.02.2006
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
IT01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
TR01.01.2014
AT09.02.2014
IE09.02.2014
LU09.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
FR03.03.2014
GB01.04.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU09.02.2006
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
IT01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
AT09.02.2014
IE09.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
FR03.03.2014
GB01.04.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2016/29]BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
IT01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
AT09.02.2014
IE09.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
FR03.03.2014
GB01.04.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2016/28]BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
AT09.02.2014
IE09.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
FR03.03.2014
GB01.04.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2016/25]BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
AT09.02.2014
IE09.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
FR03.03.2014
GB01.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/25]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
AT09.02.2014
IE09.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
FR03.03.2014
GB01.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/24]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IE09.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
FR03.03.2014
GB01.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/09]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IE09.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
FR03.03.2014
GB01.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/08]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IE09.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
FR03.03.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/07]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IE09.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/50]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/46]CY01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/39]CY01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[XA]DE3920025  (AQUALON GMBH) [X] 1,14,17-20 * Rezeptur 2; page 3, line 41 - line 46 * [A] 21;
 [XA]US5603759  (BURKHART ET AL) [X] 1-7,9-11,15,17 * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 8 * [A] 8,12,14,16;
 [X]DE3243573  (RIGIPS GMBH) [X] 1-5,9,11,14,17,18,20 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 3 *;
 [XA]EP1238951  (HORN, HELMUT) [X] 1-5,7,9,17,18,20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0011] - [0020] - [0022] - [0024] * [A] 15,21;
 [X]DE9410620U  (SZOELLOESKEI, LASZLO) [X] 1,17,18,20 * page 5 *;
 [X]FR1352694  (LEVIN, MARTIN) [X] 1,17,18 * page 1, column LI, paragraph 3 - column RE, paragraph 1 * * page 2, column LE, paragraph 11 - column RE, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]DE2930615  (GEBRUEDER RHODIUS) [A] 1,17-21 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 4 *;
 [PX]DE102004039107  (ANNELIESE ZEMENTWERKE AG) [PX] 1,2,6,8-12,14 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0040] *