Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1848389

EP1848389 - METHOD FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ABLATION PROGRAM AND MEANS FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/44]METHOD FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ABLATION PROGRAM, METHOD FOR THE ABLATION OF A MEMBER, AND MEANS FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHODS
[2011/11]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.06.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Meditec AG
Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52
07745 Jena / DE
[2007/44]
Inventor(s)01 / SLUYTERMAN VAN LANGEWEYDE, Georg
Wilhelm-Stade-Str. 14
07749 Jena / DE
02 / CABEZA-GUILLEN, Jesus, Miguel
Weilerstr. 75/1
73434 Aalen / DE
 [2008/01]
Former [2007/44]01 / SLUYTERMAN VAN LANGEWEYDE, Georg
Schleidenstrasse 6
07745 Jena / DE
02 / CABEZA-GUILLEN, Jesus, Miguel
Sophienstrasse 1
07743 Jena / DE
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/44]Geyer, Fehners & Partner
Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date06706967.415.02.2006
[2007/44]
WO2006EP01364
Priority number, dateDE2005100689715.02.2005         Original published format: DE102005006897
DE2005101325222.03.2005         Original published format: DE102005013252
[2007/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006087180
Date:24.08.2006
Language:DE
[2006/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1848389
Date:31.10.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006
[2007/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1848389
Date:20.07.2011
Language:DE
[2011/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/01, B23K26/36, B23K26/40, B23K26/00, B23K26/03, B23K26/073, B23K26/10
[2007/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/44]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ABLATIONSPROGRAMMS, IN ABHÄNGIGKEIT VON DER FORM EINES LASERSTRAHLPROFILS UND VON EINER NEIGUNG DER ZU ABLATIERENDEN OBERFLÄCHE ; MITTEL ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DER VERFAHREN[2011/11]
English:METHOD FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ABLATION PROGRAM AND MEANS FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHODS[2011/11]
French:PROCEDE POUR ETABLIR UN PROGRAMME D'ABLATIO ET SYSTEME POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE LES PROCEDES[2011/11]
Former [2007/44]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ABLATIONSPROGRAMMS, IN ABHÄNGIGKEIT VON DER FORM EINES LASERSTRAHLPROFILS UND VON EINER NEIGUNG DER ZU ABLATIERENDEN OBERFLÄCHE, VERFAHREN ZUR ABLATION EINES KÖRPERS UND MITTEL ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DER VERFAHREN
Former [2007/44]METHOD FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ABLATION PROGRAM, METHOD FOR THE ABLATION OF A MEMBER, AND MEANS FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHODS
Former [2007/44]PROCEDE POUR ETABLIR UN PROGRAMME D'ABLATION, PROCEDE POUR REALISER L'ABLATION D'UN CORPS, ET SYSTEME POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE LES PROCEDES
Entry into regional phase09.03.2007National basic fee paid 
09.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
09.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/44]
18.09.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2011Fee for grant paid
09.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.05.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.04.2012  25.04.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Medical Optics Inc.
1700 E. St. Andrew Place
Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US
Opponent's representative
Kazi, Ilya, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2012/22]
Opponent(s)01  20.04.2012  25.04.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Medical Optics Inc.
1700 E. St. Andrew Place
Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US
Opponent's representative
Kazi, Ilya, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
25.05.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.01.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
04.05.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1654/16
14.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.02.2006
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
TR20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
AT15.02.2012
LU15.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
TR20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
AT15.02.2012
LU15.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2014/21]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
TR20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
AT15.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/31]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
AT15.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/29]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
BE28.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/21]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/20]CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/12]CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/11]FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/10]FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/09]FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/08]LT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
IS20.11.2011
Cited inInternational search[YA]WO0185075  (WAVELIGHT LASER TECHNOLOGIE AG; M. MROCHEN ET AL) [Y] 1-5,10-15,17-32,68,69 * the whole document * [A] 6-9,16,34,58;
 [Y]WO0150945  (LASERSIGHT TECHNOLOGIES, INC) [Y] 1-5,10-15,17-32,68,69 * page 9, line 12 - page 12, line 27; figure - *;
 [A]US5186184  (AINDOW ET AL) [A] 1-5,10-15,17-32,68,69 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 68 *;
 [A]WO2005011544  (CARL ZEISS MEDITEC AG ; M. DICK ET AL) [A] 1-32,34-69 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5642287  (N. SOTIROPOULOS ET AL) [A] 1,17,22,33,52,58,68,69 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 10; figure - *