EP1841358 - IMPLANTABLE CHAMBER AND MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/41] | IMPLANTABLE CHAMBER, IMAGING METHOD AND MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM | ||
[2007/51] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOCK, Michael Gaisbergstrasse 44 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
UMATHUM, Reiner Häusserstrasse 33a 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
KIESSLING, Fabian Pfarrgasse 12 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
FUSENIG, Norbert Am Pferchelhang 32 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 05 /
MÜLLER, Margaretha Hauptstrasse 68 69221 Dossenheim / DE | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 D-68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06707690.1 | 10.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006EP50120 | Priority number, date | EP20050000582 | 13.01.2005 Original published format: EP 05000582 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006074996 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1841358 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G01R33/34053 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
G01R33/34084 (EP,US);
G01R33/5608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE KAMMER UND MAGNETRESONANZTOMOGRAPHIE-SYSTEM | [2007/51] | English: | IMPLANTABLE CHAMBER AND MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM | [2007/51] | French: | CHAMBRE IMPLANTABLE ET SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE A RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE | [2007/51] |
Former [2007/41] | IMPLANTIERBARE KAMMER, DARSTELLUNGSMETHODE UND MAGNETRESONANZTOMOGRAPHIE-SYSTEM | ||
Former [2007/41] | IMPLANTABLE CHAMBER, IMAGING METHOD AND MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2007/41] | CHAMBRE IMPLANTABLE, PROCEDE D'IMAGERIE ET SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE A RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 09.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4265252 (CHUBBUCK JOHN G, et al) [X] 1-5,7-14 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 39 * [A] 21; | [DA] - SCHNALL M D ET AL, "Wireless implanted magnetic resonance probes for in vivo NMR", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE USA, (198606), vol. 68, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2364, pages 161 - 167, XP002331973 [DA] 21 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US6317091 | US5819737 | US6280385 |