Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1843986

EP1843986 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A SOLID MINERAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2014
Database last updated on 25.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Minealithe
"Le Vieux Moulin"
02240 Sissy / FR
[2007/42]
Inventor(s)01 / VISOCEKAS, Fabrice
9 Place de Rungis
75013 Paris / FR
02 / WAENDENDRIES, François
Le Vieux Moulin
02240 Sissy / FR
 [2007/42]
Representative(s)Catherine, Alain , et al
Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP
14-16, Rue Ballu
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]Catherine, Alain , et al
Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2007/42]Catherine, Alain , et al
Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date06709403.711.01.2006
[2007/42]
WO2006FR50015
Priority number, dateFR2005005009711.01.2005         Original published format: FR 0550097
[2007/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006075118
Date:20.07.2006
Language:FR
[2006/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1843986
Date:17.10.2007
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006
[2007/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1843986
Date:27.11.2013
Language:FR
[2013/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:C04B28/00, C04B28/02, C04B28/26
[2012/49]
Former International [2007/42]C04B28/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FESTEN MINERALISCHEN MATERIALS[2007/42]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCING A SOLID MINERAL MATERIAL[2007/42]
French:PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER UN MATERIAU MINERAL SOLIDE[2007/42]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2007National basic fee paid 
13.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/42]
27.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2013Fee for grant paid
16.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.04.2009
Opposition(s)28.08.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
14.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.01.2006
AT27.11.2013
BG27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
IT27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
TR27.11.2013
LU11.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GR28.02.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU11.01.2006
AT27.11.2013
BG27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
IT27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
LU11.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GR28.02.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2016/29]AT27.11.2013
BG27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
IT27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
LU11.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GR28.02.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2016/28]AT27.11.2013
BG27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
LU11.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GR28.02.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2016/25]AT27.11.2013
BG27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
LU11.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2015/14]AT27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
LU11.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
LU11.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/46]AT27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
LU11.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/41]AT27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
LU11.01.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/38]AT27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
Former [2014/20]LT27.11.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03078349  (UNIV FUER CHEMIE UND TECHNOLOG [CZ], et al) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0224597  (GOODRICH CORP [US]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE10205728  (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0507368  (THORS CHEM FAB AS [NO]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0338093  (SIMFEROPOLSKY DN INZH STR I [SU]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3622568  (KILIAN GOTTFRIED DIPL WIRTSCH [DE]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [XD]JP2000129258  ;
 [XD]JPH09235147  ;
 [XD]DE19600977  (KRAFFT ALFRED PETER [DE]) [XD] 1-28 * the whole document *
 [XD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000129258 A 20000509 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [XD] 1-28 * the whole document *
 [XD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09235147 A 19970909 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [XD] 1-28 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH09235147
 US4642137
 EP0452913
 DE19600977
 DE2356524
 EP0338093