Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1844074

EP1844074 - HUMAN ANTIBODIES AND PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.2014
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Antitope Limited
Babraham Institute Babraham
Cambridge / GB
[2013/17]
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
Antitope Limited
Babraham Institute Babraham
Cambridge / GB
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Timothy David
27 Brick Row
Babraham
Cambridge, CB2 4AJ / GB
02 / BAKER, Matthew Paul, @Antitope Limited
Babraham Institute
Babraham
Cambridge / GB
 [2013/17]
Former [2007/42]01 / JONES, Timothy David
27 Brick Row, Babraham
Cambridge, CB2 4AJ / GB
02 / BAKER, Matthew Paul, Antitope Limited
Babraham Institute, Babraham
Cambridge / GB
Representative(s)Chapman, Paul William , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
[2013/17]
Former [2012/47]Chapman, Paul William , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2007/42]Hart, Deborah Mary , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date06709606.503.02.2006
[2007/42]
WO2006GB00355
Priority number, dateGB2005000220103.02.2005         Original published format: GB 0502201
GB2005000319016.02.2005         Original published format: GB 0503190
GB2005000694505.04.2005         Original published format: GB 0506945
[2007/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006082406
Date:10.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1844074
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006
[2007/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1844074
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Search report(s)International search reportEP01.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/00, C07K19/00, C07K16/32, C07K16/28, C07K16/42, C07K16/24, C07K16/46, C07K14/18, C07K14/415, C07K14/815
[2007/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/42]
TitleGerman:MENSCHLICHE ANTIKÖRPER UND PROTEINE[2007/42]
English:HUMAN ANTIBODIES AND PROTEINS[2007/42]
French:PROTEINES ET ANTICORPS HUMAINS[2007/42]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2007National basic fee paid 
05.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/42]
07.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2012Date of oral proceedings
10.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.08.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2013Fee for grant paid
13.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11177723.1  / EP2388271
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.08.2009
Opposition(s)27.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.02.2010Request for further processing filed
23.02.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.12.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.02.2006
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU03.02.2006
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/44]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/11]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/10]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/52]CY24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/50]FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/49]FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/48]LT24.04.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT24.04.2013
PT26.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004180386  (CARR FRANCIS J [GB], et al) [X] 1-10,16-27,34-36 * examples 21,22; claims 1-21 *;
 [X]  - ROQUE-NAVARRO LOURDES ET AL, "Humanization of predicted T-cell epitopes reduces the immunogenicity of chimeric antibodies: New evidence supporting a simple method.", HYBRIDOMA AND HYBRIDOMICS, (200308), vol. 22, no. 4, ISSN 1536-8599, pages 245 - 257, XP002397469 [X] 1-10,16-27,34-36 * page 246, column L, line 5 - column R, line 2; table 1 * * page 253, column R, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/153685903322328974
 [X]  - PENICHET MANUEL L ET AL, "Design and engineering human forms of monoclonal antibodies", DRUG DEVELOPMENT RESEARCH, (200403), vol. 61, no. 3, ISSN 0272-4391, pages 121 - 136, XP002397470 [X] 1-10,19 * page 126, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ddr.10347
ExaminationWO03042247
    - DE GROOT A S ET AL, "DE-IMMUNIZATION OF THERAPEUTIC PROTEINS BY T-CELL EPITOPE MODIFICATION", DEVELOPMENTS IN BIOLOGICALS, KARGER, BASEL, (20050101), vol. 122, ISSN 1424-6074, pages 171 - 194, XP008074262
    - BASELGA J, "PHASE I AND II CLINICAL TRIALS OF TRASTUZUMAB", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY, KLUWER, DORDRECHT, NL, (20010101), vol. 12, no. SUPPL. 01, doi:10.1023/A:1011167909059, ISSN 0923-7534, pages S49 - S55, XP009063466

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1011167909059
by applicantUS5821337
 US5874060
 WO9911777
 US6277969
 WO03042247
 US5656272
    - Molecular Cloning: A Laboaratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001), vol. 1-3,
    - ORLANDI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (1989), vol. 86, pages 3833 - 3837,
    - THOMPSON E, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 80,
    - BERMAN ET AL., THE PROTEIN DATA BANK, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 28, pages 235 - 242,
    - SALI; BLUNDELL, J. MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 234, pages 779 - 815,
    - PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 3, no. 6, page 318,
    - KABAT ET AL., Sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, NIH PUBLICATION 91-3242, (1991),
    - BENSON ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, page L-6,
    - CARTER ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 4285,
    - Molecular Cloning, A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001), vol. 1-3,
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS,
    - HUDZIAK ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (198903), pages 1165 - 1172,
    - SCOTT ET AL., CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 3254 - 3261,
    - PRESTA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, no. 5, pages 2623 - 2632,
    - FLICKER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 165, pages 3849 - 3859,
    - KNAPPIK ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 296, pages 57 - 86,
    - PRODROMOU; PEARL, PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1992), vol. 5, pages 827 - 829,
    - CARTER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167,
    - ESPEVIK ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1986), vol. 95, pages 99 - 105,